This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2020 at 12:38:28 (UTC).

Smith v. Saul

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 Smith filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lajuana M. Counts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-03215

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lajuana M. Counts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dawn Lee Smith

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kathleen Overton

Attorney at Parmele Law Firm

1505 E. Bradford Parkway

Springfield, MO 65804

Defendant Attorney

OGCSSAR7

Attorney at Office of General Counsel-SSA Region 7

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Andrew M. Saul, Dawn Lee Smith. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Melvin, Greg) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 8/3/2020 Social security answer due by 10/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. Record of Submission due by 11/2/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served: US Atty 8/3/20; Atty General 8/6/20; Office of Regional Counsel 8/4/20)(Overton, Kathleen) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketSUMMONSES ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Summonses returned via email to counsel for service. (Burch, Steve) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Dawn Lee Smith. (Filing fee $400 receipt number IFP) filed byKathleen Overton on behalf of Dawn Lee Smith. Service due by 10/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Overton, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORAL ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's counsel shall be responsible for electronically filing the Complaint within 10 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff shall be responsible for serving process in the manner described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i). Signed on July 15, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 8/4/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Dawn Lee Smith. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Attorney Kathleen Overton added to party Dawn Lee Smith(pty:pla))(Overton, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less