This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:03:10 (UTC).

Smith v. Safeco Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Smith filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Safeco Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Breyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-07963

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Breyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sue Smith

Oakland, CA 94610

Defendant

Safeco Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas Justin Boos

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale, LLP

600 Montgomery Street, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Norman Lau

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale, LLP

600 Montgomery Street, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2020 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#9

(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019) (ls, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

8 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#8

(#8) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 12/13/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#7

(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Safeco Insurance Company of America.. (Lau, Norman) (Filed on 12/11/2019) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#5

(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Lau, Norman) (Filed on 12/6/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties or Entities filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation for Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Declaration of Nicholas Boos

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Alameda. Their case number is RG19009060, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13950076). Filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Nicholas Boos, #(2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/4/2019) Modified on 12/5/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/6/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2020 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2020) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019) (ls, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 12/13/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2019) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2019) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Safeco Insurance Company of America.. (Lau, Norman) (Filed on 12/11/2019) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Lau, Norman) (Filed on 12/6/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketAnswer to Removal Complaint [refer to docket 1-page 13] submitted by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/18/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Parties or Entities filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation for Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/4/2019) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Alameda. Their case number is RG19009060, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13950076). Filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Nicholas Boos, #(2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Boos, Nicholas) (Filed on 12/4/2019) Modified on 12/5/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less