This case was last updated from PACER on 12/21/2019 at 07:26:25 (UTC).

Smith v. Rivers

Case Summary

On 10/22/2019 Smith filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Rivers. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tom S. Lee and Robert H. Walker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00749

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tom S. Lee

Referral Judge

Robert H. Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Johnnell Smith, Sr.

Yazoo City, MS 39194

Defendant

Warden C. Rivers

Interested Party

Pro Se Department

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Robert Gregg Mayer-Federal Gov, Jr.

Attorney at U. S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE - Jackson

501 East Court Street, Suite 4.430

Jackson, MS 39201

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by C. Rivers (Mayer-Federal Gov, Robert) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#9

(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Warden C. Rivers served on 12/13/2019. (PG) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Gregg Mayer-Federal Gov, Jr on behalf of C. Rivers (Mayer-Federal Gov, Robert) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to C. Rivers, Civil Process Clerk served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (VM) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER, Respondent Warden C. Rivers shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this case within 20 days of the service of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 12/11/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

5 #2

Envelope

5 #1

Attachment Request for Withdrawal of Inmate Funds

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Written Explanation of Payment by Johnnell Smith, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Request for Withdrawal of Inmate Funds, #2 Envelope)(VM) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) ORDER, on or before November 22, 2019, petitioner shall complete and file the attached application or pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 10/23/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

1 #3

Notice of Assignment

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Attachment Supplemental Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Johnnell Smith, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Documents, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment)(VM) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. C. Rivers answer due 2/7/2020. No further written order will issue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on December 18, 2019 (King, Steve) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by C. Rivers (Mayer-Federal Gov, Robert) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Warden C. Rivers served on 12/13/2019. (PG) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Gregg Mayer-Federal Gov, Jr on behalf of C. Rivers (Mayer-Federal Gov, Robert) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to C. Rivers, Civil Process Clerk served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (VM) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER, Respondent Warden C. Rivers shall file an answer or other responsive pleading in this case within 20 days of the service of a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 12/11/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Filing fee received: $5, receipt number 34643057530. (VM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Written Explanation of Payment by Johnnell Smith, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Request for Withdrawal of Inmate Funds, #2 Envelope)(VM) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER *RESTRICTED* denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. $5.00 filing fee due within 20 days, as set out herein. Signed by District Judge Tom S. Lee on 11/13/19 (NEF/order mailed to plaintiff at #20001-026, Yazoo City Federal Correctional Complex-Low, 2225 Haley Barbour Parkway, P.O. Box 5000, Yazoo City, MS 39194) (LWE) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis re #2 Order by Johnnell Smith, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(VM) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER, on or before November 22, 2019, petitioner shall complete and file the attached application or pay the $5.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker on 10/23/2019. [Copy mailed to petitioner] (LDR) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Johnnell Smith, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Documents, #2 Envelope, #3 Notice of Assignment)(VM) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.