This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/18/2020 at 08:06:12 (UTC).

SMITH v. RB DISTRIBUTION, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 SMITH filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against RB DISTRIBUTION, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is GERALD A. MCHUGH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00900

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GERALD A. MCHUGH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHANIKA SMITH

Defendants

DORMAN PRODUCTS, INC.

GERALD BUMPERS

RB DISTRIBUTION, INC.

JOSE ROSARIO

SHIRLEY CHERNYK

ED IVOC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SUSAN C. KEESLER

Attorney at DEREK SMITH LAW GROUP PLLC

1835 Market St Suite 2950

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHANIKA SMITH. DORMAN PRODUCTS, INC. waiver sent on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (KEESLER, SUSAN) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHANIKA SMITH. RB DISTRIBUTION, INC. waiver sent on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (KEESLER, SUSAN) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHANIKA SMITH. SHIRLEY CHERNYK waiver sent on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (KEESLER, SUSAN) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHANIKA SMITH. ED IVOC waiver sent on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (KEESLER, SUSAN) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHANIKA SMITH. GERALD BUMPERS waiver sent on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (KEESLER, SUSAN) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • Docket6 Summons Issued as to GERALD BUMPERS, SHIRLEY CHERNYK, DORMAN PRODUCTS, INC., ED IVOC, RB DISTRIBUTION, INC., JOSE ROSARIO. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 2/19/2020 (bw, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by SHANIKA SMITH. (bw, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GERALD BUMPERS, SHIRLEY CHERNYK, DORMAN PRODUCTS, INC., ED IVOC, RB DISTRIBUTION, INC., JOSE ROSARIO ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE211621.), filed by SHANIKA SMITH.(bw, ) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RB Distribution, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DOWMAN PRODUCTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUSAN C. KEESLER