This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2020 at 07:11:08 (UTC).

Smith v. Petsmart, The Petfood Superstore

Case Summary

On 10/28/2020 Smith filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Petsmart, The Petfood Superstore. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joan M. Azrack and Steven I. Locke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05204

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan M. Azrack

Referral Judge

Steven I. Locke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bruce Smith

Defendant

Petsmart, The Petfood Superstore

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Karl J. Silverberg

Attorney at Silverberg, P.C.

320 Carleton Avenue, Suite 6400

Central Islip, NY 11722

Defendant Attorney

Seth Brian Rubine

Attorney at RUBINE & CHA, LLC, Attorneys at Law

65 Harristown Road, Suite 203

Glen Rock, NJ 07452

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Verified ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Petsmart, The Petfood Superstore. (Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Brian Rubine on behalf of Petsmart, The Petfood Superstore (aty to be noticed) (Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

#7

(#7) CASE REFERRED to Arbitration.This case has been designated to participate in the Court Annexed Arbitration Program pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.7(d). The Rule requires the Clerk of Court to designate and process for compulsory arbitration "all civil cases (excluding social security cases, tax matters, prisoners' civil rights cases, and any action based on an alleged violation of a right secured by the Constitution of the United States or if jurisdiction is based in whole or in part on Title 28 U.S.C. sec. 1343) wherein money damages only are being sought in an amount not in excess of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs." Damages are presumed not to be in excess of the arbitration limit unless a certification is filed in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.7(d) (3). An Arbitration Hearing will be scheduled after an Answer is filed. The hearing will occur approximately 120 days after filing of the Answer. (Credle, Rita) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Petsmart, The Petfood Superstore. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#5

(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Bruce Smith (Silverberg, Karl) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. by Bruce Smith (Silverberg, Karl) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Bruce Smith against Petsmart, The Petfood Superstore filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13600238 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Bruce Smith. (Silverberg, Karl) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Verified ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Petsmart, The Petfood Superstore. (Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Seth Brian Rubine on behalf of Petsmart, The Petfood Superstore (aty to be noticed) (Rubine, Seth) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CASE REFERRED to Arbitration.This case has been designated to participate in the Court Annexed Arbitration Program pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.7(d). The Rule requires the Clerk of Court to designate and process for compulsory arbitration "all civil cases (excluding social security cases, tax matters, prisoners' civil rights cases, and any action based on an alleged violation of a right secured by the Constitution of the United States or if jurisdiction is based in whole or in part on Title 28 U.S.C. sec. 1343) wherein money damages only are being sought in an amount not in excess of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs." Damages are presumed not to be in excess of the arbitration limit unless a certification is filed in accordance with Local Civil Rule 83.7(d) (3). An Arbitration Hearing will be scheduled after an Answer is filed. The hearing will occur approximately 120 days after filing of the Answer. (Credle, Rita) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Petsmart, The Petfood Superstore. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Bruce Smith (Silverberg, Karl) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. by Bruce Smith (Silverberg, Karl) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Bruce Smith against Petsmart, The Petfood Superstore filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13600238 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Bruce Smith. (Silverberg, Karl) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seth B. Rubine