This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 12:50:36 (UTC).

Smith v. Penguin Random House LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 Smith filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Penguin Random House LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John P. Cronan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04597

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John P. Cronan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ali Smith

Defendants

Penguin Random House LLC

Does 1 through 10 inclusive

Blackie Books, SLU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan E. Carreon

Attorney at Higbee & Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drivesuite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#13

12 #3

Proposed Order

12 #2

Affidavit

12 #1

Certificate of Good Standing for Ryan Carreon

12 #12

Main Document

#11

#10

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER: The Initial Pretrial Conference (IPTC) scheduled for July 21, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. is adjourned to August 19, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261. If Defendants do not appear by August 12, 2021, Plaintiff is directed to file a status letter with the Court on that date. Initial Conference set for 8/19/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge John P. Cronan. (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 7/16/2021) (nb) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Blackie Books, SLU. (vf) . (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Ryan E. Carreon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge John P. Cronan)(Text Only Order) (mhe) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #12 MOTION for Ryan E. Carreon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BLACKIE BOOKS SLU, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ali Smith..(Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Ryan E. Carreon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ali Smith. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing for Ryan Carreon, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order).(Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • Docket***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 9 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING -SUBMITTED. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (sj) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: This case has been assigned to the undersigned for all purposes. All counsel must familiarize themselves with the Court's Individual Rules, which are available at https://www.nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-john-p-cronan. Counsel for all parties are hereby ORDERED to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on July 21, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will conduct the IPTC by teleconference. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties should call (866) 434-5269, access code 9176261, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Initial Conference set for 7/21/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge John P. Cronan.) (Signed by Judge John P. Cronan on 5/25/2021) (rjm) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Ryan E. Carreon to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name must match exactly as pleading in docket entry and in 'To' field of PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John P. Cronan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ryan E. Carreon. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #7 MOTION for Ryan E. Carreon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24575306. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Ryan E. Carreon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24575306. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ali Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order).(Carreon, Ryan) Modified on 5/24/2021 (wb). (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties. Document filed by Ali Smith..(Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to BLACKIE BOOKS, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ali Smith..(Carreon, Ryan) Modified on 5/24/2021 (sj). (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PENGUIN RANDOM HOUSE LLC!, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ali Smith..(Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Blackie Books, SLU, Does 1 through 10 inclusive, Penguin Random House LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24574771)Document filed by Ali Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C).(Carreon, Ryan) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Penguin Random House LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan E Carreon