This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 08:08:06 (UTC).

Smith v. Omron

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Smith filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against Omron. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sharon Johnson Coleman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-08121

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon Johnson Coleman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charmaine Smith

Memphis, TN 38119

Defendant

Omron

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Case called on 1/21/2020 for a hearing as to plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 . Plaintiff did not appear. Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. Status hearing is set for 2/25/2020 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Charmaine Smith for transport at Government's expense F.R.C.P. 7(b)(1). (ym, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pro se Plaintiff Charmane Smith brings a "motion for transport at government expense" under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7(b)(1), seeking the costs travel to Chicago from Tennessee to attend the motion hearings in her two lawsuits. Rule 7(b)(1), however, concerns the form of pleadings and has nothing to do with transporting pro se plaintiffs to district courts where they have filed lawsuits. Plaintiff is the "master of her own complaint" and may file it where the court has jurisdiction and where venue is proper. That said, the court (or the public treasury) is not obligated to pay for plaintiff's travel to pursue her lawsuit in another state. See Johnson v. Daley, 339 F.3d 582, 586 (7th Cir. 2003). Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#4

(#4) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Charmaine Smith. (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Charmaine Smith. (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#3

(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Charmaine Smith for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing for plaintiff to present her application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as well as to discuss the allegations in her complaint for the Court's initial screening for pro se complaints under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1) is set for 1/21/2020 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Case called on 1/21/2020 for a hearing as to plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 . Plaintiff did not appear. Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. Status hearing is set for 2/25/2020 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pro se Plaintiff Charmane Smith brings a "motion for transport at government expense" under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7(b)(1), seeking the costs travel to Chicago from Tennessee to attend the motion hearings in her two lawsuits. Rule 7(b)(1), however, concerns the form of pleadings and has nothing to do with transporting pro se plaintiffs to district courts where they have filed lawsuits. Plaintiff is the "master of her own complaint" and may file it where the court has jurisdiction and where venue is proper. That said, the court (or the public treasury) is not obligated to pay for plaintiff's travel to pursue her lawsuit in another state. See Johnson v. Daley, 339 F.3d 582, 586 (7th Cir. 2003). Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Charmaine Smith for transport at Government's expense F.R.C.P. 7(b)(1). (ym, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing for plaintiff to present her application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as well as to discuss the allegations in her complaint for the Court's initial screening for pro se complaints under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1) is set for 1/21/2020 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Charmaine Smith. (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Charmaine Smith for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Charmaine Smith. (gcy, ) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.