This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/16/2019 at 07:06:23 (UTC).

Smith v. Oklahoma State of et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 Smith filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Oklahoma State of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gary M. Purcell and David L. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00868

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gary M. Purcell

Presiding Judge

David L. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicois M Smith

Defendants

FNU Cambell

Oklahoma State of

FNU Rios

Oklahoma County Sheriff's Office

FNU Texas

FNU Lamb

Oklahoma County Detention Center

 

Court Documents

24 #1

Envelope

#24

(#24) Exhibit to the Court by Nicois M Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#23

(#23) ORDER finding as Moot #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #22 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see Order for further details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall not issue process until further order of the Court, and the Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to the agency having custody of Plaintiff.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 11/7/2019. (cps) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

22 #1

Envelope

#22

(#22) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nicois M Smith. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

21 #1

Envelope

#21

(#21) MOTION to Amend and Request to Gather Evidence, by Nicois M Smith. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

20 #1

Envelope

#20

(#20) Affidavit and MOTION to Amend, by Nicois M Smith. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Amend/Correct, by Nicois M Smith. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/18/2019. (cps) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#23) ORDER finding as Moot #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #22 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see Order for further details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall not issue process until further order of the Court, and the Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to the agency having custody of Plaintiff.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 11/7/2019. (cps) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#4

Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #3 Order Reassigning Case, #4 Order Referring Case, #1 Complaint, to: Nicois M Smith OKLAHOMA CITY-OCDC 201 N Shartel Oklahoma City, OK 73102 (kmt) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#3

Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #3 Order Reassigning Case, #4 Order Referring Case, #1 Complaint, to: Nicois M Smith OKLAHOMA CITY-OCDC 201 N Shartel Oklahoma City, OK 73102 (kmt) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#2

(#2) PREVIOUS Cases (kmt) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #3 Order Reassigning Case, #4 Order Referring Case, #1 Complaint, to: Nicois M Smith OKLAHOMA CITY-OCDC 201 N Shartel Oklahoma City, OK 73102 (kmt) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Exhibit to the Court by Nicois M Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER finding as Moot #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #22 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please see Order for further details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall not issue process until further order of the Court, and the Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to the agency having custody of Plaintiff.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 11/7/2019. (cps) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nicois M Smith. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION to Amend and Request to Gather Evidence, by Nicois M Smith. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Affidavit and MOTION to Amend, by Nicois M Smith. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE (other) titled, "Conflict of Interest" by Nicois M Smith (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) AFFIDAVIT by Nicois M Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MOTION of Discovery and Exhibit and Summary of Conflict of Interest, by Nicois M Smith. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION for Discovery and Motion to Amend, by Nicois M Smith. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Envelope dated 09.12.19, #2 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff must submit a certified copy of the statement(s) of his institutional financial account(s) for the previous six month period, as well as a signature of an authorized officer of the facility in which he is incarcerated, no later than November 8th, 2019. Failure to comply with this Order shall result in the recommendation that Plaintiff's action be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 10/9/2019. (cps) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Compel by Nicois M Smith. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Discovery by Nicois M Smith. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Amend/Correct, by Nicois M Smith. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(nv) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 9/18/2019. (cps) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, #3 Order Reassigning Case, #4 Order Referring Case, #1 Complaint, to: Nicois M Smith OKLAHOMA CITY-OCDC 201 N Shartel Oklahoma City, OK 73102 (kmt) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nicois M Smith. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Signed by the direction of Honorable David L. Russell on 9/17/19. (kmt) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable David L. Russell for all further proceedings. Honorable Patrick R Wyrick no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Honorable Timothy D. DeGiusti on 9/17/19. (kmt) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PREVIOUS Cases (kmt) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against FNU Cambell(In official capacity, Detention Officer), FNU Cambell(Individually), FNU Lamb(Individually), FNU Lamb(In official capacity, Detention Officer), Oklahoma County Detention Center, Oklahoma County Sheriff's Office, Oklahoma State of, FNU Rios, FNU Texas(In official capacity, Detention Officer), FNU Texas(Individually) filed by Nicois M Smith. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kmt) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less