This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/10/2020 at 08:22:00 (UTC).

Smith v. Ocwen Financial Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 Smith filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Ocwen Financial Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wyoming District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott W Skavdahl and Kelly H Rankin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00254

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott W Skavdahl

Referral Judge

Kelly H Rankin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel J Smith

Defendants

HSBC Bank USA National Association

Ocwen Financial Corporation

PHH Mortgage Corporation

Newrez LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gay Vanderpoel Woodhouse

Christopher M Brennan

Defendant Attorney

Cynthia Lowery-Graber

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

16 #2

Proposed Order

16 #1

Exhibit

#16

#15

6 #2

Proposed Order

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Magistrate Consent Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by HSBC Bank USA National Association, Newrez LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Lowery-Graber, Cynthia) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Smith. (Woodhouse, Gay) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant HSBC Bank USA National Association, Newrez LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation, filed by Daniel J Smith. (Court Staff, sjlg) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Initial Pretrial Conference: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2020 11:00 AM in Judge Rankin Chambers (Room No. 2204) before Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. All parties shall appear by telephone through the Courts conference call system.Guests call: Toll Free 1-888-398-2342| Access code 3107456. | Join as guest Press # |Security code 1001#. (Court Staff, szf) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER by the Honorable Kelly H Rankin granting #16 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. Plaintiff must file his amended complaint by Friday, January 24, 2020. (Court Staff, sem) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Brennan, Christopher) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, by HSBC Bank USA National Association, PHH Mortgage Corporation, Ocwen Financial Corporation, Newrez LLC. (Lowery-Graber, Cynthia) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Daniel J Smith (Woodhouse, Gay) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Daniel J Smith (Woodhouse, Gay) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel J Smith. HSBC Bank USA National Association served on 12/16/2019, answer due on 1/6/2020 (Woodhouse, Gay) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 MOTION for Expedited Discovery served on PHH Mortgage Corporation on 12/20/2019 by Plaintiff Daniel J Smith (Woodhouse, Gay) Modified text on 1/2/2020 (Court Staff, scat). (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 MOTION for Expedited Discovery served on NewRez LLC on 12/20/2019 by Plaintiff Daniel J Smith (Woodhouse, Gay) Modified text on 1/2/2020 (Court Staff, scat). (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions No Longer Referred: #6 MOTION for Order. Motion no longer assigned to Honorable Scott W. Skavdahl. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kelly H. Rankin (Court Staff, stbd) Modified text on 12/20/2019 (Court Staff, scat). (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cynthia Lowery-Graber on behalf of HSBC Bank USA National Association, Newrez LLC, Ocwen Financial Corporation, PHH Mortgage Corporation (Lowery-Graber, Cynthia) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. MOTION for Order to Expedite Discovery filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Woodhouse, Gay) Modified event and text on 12/19/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg). Modified on 12/19/2019 (Court Staff, stbd). (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel J Smith. PHH Mortgage Corporation served on 12/13/2019, answer due on 1/3/2020 (Brennan, Christopher) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel J Smith. Newrez LLC served on 12/13/2019, answer due on 1/3/2020 (Brennan, Christopher) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel J Smith. Ocwen Financial Corporation served on 12/13/2019, answer due on 1/3/2020 (Brennan, Christopher) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Praecipe for summonses filed by Plaintiff Daniel J Smith, 4 issued. (Court Staff, sjlg) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (four summonses issued) ( Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY032169.), filed by Daniel J Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Magistrate Consent Form) (Court Staff, sjlg) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less