This case was last updated from PACER on 09/04/2021 at 09:31:50 (UTC).

Smith v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co/Scottsdale Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Smith filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co/Scottsdale Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01938

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Cody Smith

Defendants

Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company/Scottsdale Insurance Company

Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co / Scottsdale Insurance Co

Scottsdale Insurance Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Wells Talbot Watson

Attorney at Baggett McCall et al

P O Drawer 7820

Lake Charles, LA 70606-7820

Jake Danten Buford

Attorney at Baggett McCall et al

P O Drawer 7820

Lake Charles, LA 70606-7820

Jeffrey T Gaughan

Attorney at Baggett McCall et al

P O Drawer 7820

Lake Charles, LA 70606-7820

Joseph W Rausch

Attorney at Gauthier Murphy & Houghtaling

3500 N Hullen St

Metairie, LA 70002

Meagan Nicole Johnson

Attorney at Baggett McCall et al

P O Drawer 7820

Lake Charles, LA 70606-7820

Melissa A Shaw-Brown

Attorney at Baggett McCall et al

P O Drawer 7820

Lake Charles, LA 70606-7820

Zita Marie Andrus

Attorney at Baggett McCall et al

P O Drawer 7820

Lake Charles, LA 70606-7820

Defendant Attorneys

John Powers Wolff, III

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Cole Cisco Frazier

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Jennifer Rae Dietz

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (BR)

701 Main St

Baton Rouge, LA 70062

Richard William Wolff

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Sydnee Doolittle Menou

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Co.(aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

(#10) ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN WRONG CASE - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Thomas, T) Modified on 8/24/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 08/24/2021)

7 #1

Proposed order

#7

(#7) MOTION to Expedite consideration of #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent sought but not yet obtained by Scottsdale Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Wolff, John) Modified on 8/2/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scottsdale Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co for Scottsdale Insurance Co. (aty,Wolff, John) Modified on 8/2/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 08/02/2021)

5 #1

Proposed order

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Cody Smith. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co / Scottsdale Insurance Co served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (aty,Watson, Wells) (Entered: 07/18/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co / Scottsdale Insurance Co. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co/Scottsdale Insurance Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4727517) filed by James Cody Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Wells Talbot Watson added to party James Cody Smith(pty:pla))(aty,Watson, Wells) Modified docket text on 7/6/2021 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 07/06/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Co.(aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Corrective Action regarding #10 Case Management Order No. 1. Action taken: Modified to indicate electronically filed in wrong case. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONICALLY FILED IN WRONG CASE - CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Thomas, T) Modified on 8/24/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #7 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge James D. Cain, Jr. on 8/3/2021. (crt,Fontenot, S) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Scottsdale Insurance Co answer due 8/27/2021. Signed by Judge James D. Cain, Jr. on 8/3/2021. (crt,Fontenot, S) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Expedite consideration of #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent sought but not yet obtained by Scottsdale Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Wolff, John) Modified on 8/2/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scottsdale Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co for Scottsdale Insurance Co. (aty,Wolff, John) Modified on 8/2/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent sought but not yet obtained by Scottsdale Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney John Powers Wolff, III added to party Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co / Scottsdale Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Wolff, John) Modified to correct filer on 8/2/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Cody Smith. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co / Scottsdale Insurance Co served on 7/16/2021, answer due 8/6/2021. (aty,Watson, Wells) (Entered: 07/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co / Scottsdale Insurance Co. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co/Scottsdale Insurance Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4727517) filed by James Cody Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Wells Talbot Watson added to party James Cody Smith(pty:pla))(aty,Watson, Wells) Modified docket text on 7/6/2021 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Rae Dietz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard William Wolff