This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2021 at 08:43:04 (UTC).

Smith v. Motion Industries, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 Smith filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Motion Industries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher A. Boyko. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00985

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher A. Boyko

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cassandra L. Smith

Defendant

Motion Industries, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric H. Griebling

Attorney at Sears, Pry, Griebling & McBride

120 North Lane Street, P.O. Box 309

Bucyrus, OH 44820

Frank E. Piscitelli, Jr.

Attorney at Piscitelli Law Firm

8440 Station Street

Mentor, OH 44060

Defendant Attorneys

Clifford C. Masch

Attorney at Reminger Co. - Cleveland

1400 Midland Bldg., 101 Prospect Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44115

Daniel C. Egger

Attorney at Reminger Co. - Cleveland

1400 Midland Bldg., 101 Prospect Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44115

 

Court Documents

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Genuine Parts Company for Motion Industries, Inc. filed by Motion Industries, Inc.. (Masch, Clifford) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketNotice by Clerk that Motion Industries, Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (S,SR) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Answer to #1 Complaint filed by Motion Industries, Inc.. (Masch, Clifford) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Return of Service by certified mail executed upon Motion Industries, Inc. on 5/24/2021, filed on behalf of Cassandra L. Smith Related document(s) #1 . (Piscitelli, Frank) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Motion Industries, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form). (L,MI) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (L,MI) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketJudge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (L,MI) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with jury demand against Motion Industries, Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 402, Receipt number AOHNDC-10829744.. Filed by Cassandra Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Piscitelli, Frank) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOTION INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank E Piscitelli, Jr