This case was last updated from PACER on 02/13/2021 at 12:56:41 (UTC).

Smith v. Mondelez Global LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Smith filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Mondelez Global LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steve C. Jones and Regina D Cannon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05088

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steve C. Jones

Referral Judge

Regina D Cannon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah Smith

Defendants

Mondelez Global LLC

Mondelez International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kirby Smith

Attorney at The Kirby G. Smith Law Firm, LLC

Suite 105, 4488 N. Shallowford Rd.

Atlanta, GA 30338

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deborah Smith. Mondelez Global LLC waiver mailed on 1/12/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Smith, Kirby) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#3

(#3) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/2020. (tcc) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Mondelez Global LLC. (tcc) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Deborah Smith. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10495419) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet )(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deborah Smith. Mondelez Global LLC waiver mailed on 1/12/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Smith, Kirby) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NINTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 12/8/2020. (tcc) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Mondelez Global LLC. (tcc) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Deborah Smith. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-10495419) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet )(tcc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MONDELEZ INTERNATIONAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Mondelez Global LLC Group Benefits Plan. the is a litigant