This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/25/2021 at 09:32:57 (UTC).

Smith v. Midland Credit Management, Inc. (CONSENT)

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 Smith filed an Other lawsuit against Midland Credit Management, Inc CONSENT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jerusha T. Adams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00715

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jerusha T. Adams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tonya Smith

Defendant

Midland Credit Management, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mary Elizabeth Philipps

Attorney at Philipps & Philipps, Ltd.

9760 S. Roberts Road; Suite 1

Palos Hills, IL 60465

Bradford Wayne Botes

Attorney at Bond Botes Reese & Shinn PC

15 Southlake Lane; Suite 140

Birmingham, AL 35244

David Joseph Philipps

Attorney at Philipps & Philipps, Ltd

9760 S Roberts Road; Ste 1

Palos Hills, IL 60465-1629

Defendant Attorneys

Jason Brent Tompkins

Attorney at Balch & Bingham LLP

1901 Sixth Avenue North; Suite 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

Robert Baxley

Attorney at Balch and Bingham

1901 6Th Avenue Northsuite 1500

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER construing the #16 Notice of Settlement to contain a Motion to Stay All Court Deadlines; it is ORDERED as follows: 1) The #16 motion to stay all deadlines is GRANTED; 2) All pending deadlines are continued generally; 3) The parties shall file a joint stipulation of dismissal on or before 1/31/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 12/20/2021. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#18

(#18) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge e-signed by counsel for Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#17

(#17) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge e-signed by counsel for Plaintiff Tonya Smith. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Settlement by Tonya Smith (Philipps, David) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/27/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 11/29/2021. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER directing that the parties should now make their selection in writing to consent or request reassignment; directing the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 12/20/2021, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 11/29/2021. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#13

(#13) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Midland Credit Management, Inc. re #12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Baxley, Robert) Modified on 11/30/2021 to add the link to the #12 Notice (amf, ). (Entered: 11/29/2021)

12 #1

Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment

12 #12

Main Document

3 #3

Main Document

#2

(#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tonya Smith. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

1 #6

fee receipt

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER construing the #16 Notice of Settlement to contain a Motion to Stay All Court Deadlines; it is ORDERED as follows: 1) The #16 motion to stay all deadlines is GRANTED; 2) All pending deadlines are continued generally; 3) The parties shall file a joint stipulation of dismissal on or before 1/31/2022. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 12/20/2021. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge e-signed by counsel for Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge e-signed by counsel for Plaintiff Tonya Smith. (amf, ) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to Stay All Court Deadlines by Tonya Smith, as CONSTRUED in the Court's #19 Order. (No PDF attached to this entry - See doc #16 for PDF) (amf, ) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Settlement by Tonya Smith (Philipps, David) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER directing that the Rule 26(f) report containing the discovery plan shall be filed as soon as practicable, as further set out in order; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/27/2021. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 11/29/2021. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER directing that the parties should now make their selection in writing to consent or request reassignment; directing the parties to complete the appropriate attached form so that the form is received by the clerk on or before 12/20/2021, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 11/29/2021. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Midland Credit Management, Inc. re #12 Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement. (Baxley, Robert) Modified on 11/30/2021 to add the link to the #12 Notice (amf, ). (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc.; Corporate Disclosures due by 12/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Attachment)(amf, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for Defendant Midland Credit Management, Inc.. (amf, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Return Receipt Card showing service of summons and complaint signed by Kelly Webster for Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 10/29/2021, answer due 11/19/2021. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mary E. Philipps. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 10/29/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David J. Philipps. Signed by Honorable Judge Jerusha T. Adams on 10/29/2021. (bes, ) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge sent to counsel for (plaintiff) Tonya Smith. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. and mailed CMRRR with copy of complaint to defendant. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion for Mary Elizabeth Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Receipt No. 4602065044, Filing fee $ 75.00.) by Tonya Smith. (Attachments: #1 state bar certificate, #2 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2021 to attach federal court certificate: #3 corrected certificate of good standing) (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion for David Joseph Phillips to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Receipt No. 4602065045, Filing fee $ 75.00.) by Tonya Smith. (Attachments: #1 state bar certificate, #2 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/3/2021 to attach federal court certificate: #3 corrected certificate of good standing) (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Tonya Smith. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tonya Smith. (NO PDF document attached to this notice-See Docket entry #1 ). (djy, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Midland Credit Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number 4602065043.), filed by Tonya Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 fee receipt)(djy, ) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason B Tompkins