This case was last updated from PACER on 12/06/2020 at 07:06:01 (UTC).

Smith v. Lyft, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 Smith filed an Other lawsuit against Lyft, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Margo K. Brodie and Robert M. Levy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-04805

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Margo K. Brodie

Referral Judge

Robert M. Levy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jamie Smith

Defendant

Lyft, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C.K. Lee

Attorney at Lee Litigation Group, PLLC

148 West 24Th Street, Ste 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10011

Defendant Attorney

Alvin Lee

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lyft, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent none for Lyft, Inc.. (Lee, Alvin) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#9

(#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint - Stipulation extending defendant's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint until December 24, 2020 by Lyft, Inc.. (Lee, Alvin) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Alvin Lee on behalf of Lyft, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Lee, Alvin) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamie Smith. Lyft, Inc. served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#6

(#6) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#5

(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Lyft, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Jamie Smith (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Jamie Smith (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Lyft, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13484510 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jamie Smith. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lyft, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent none for Lyft, Inc.. (Lee, Alvin) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint - Stipulation extending defendant's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint until December 24, 2020 by Lyft, Inc.. (Lee, Alvin) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Alvin Lee on behalf of Lyft, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Lee, Alvin) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamie Smith. Lyft, Inc. served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Lyft, Inc.. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint by Jamie Smith (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint by Jamie Smith (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Lyft, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13484510 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jamie Smith. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lyft, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer C.K. Lee