This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/10/2021 at 07:42:49 (UTC).

Smith v. Legacy Partners Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 Smith filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Legacy Partners Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00629

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Addie Smith

Defendants

Christina Jones

Michael Holt

Syres Properties

Glen Ceridono

Sywest Development

Joseph Syufy

Legacy Partners Inc

Syufy Enterprises LP

Syhadley LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Beverly G Grant

Jeffery D Bradley

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony B Byergo

Kathryn P Fletcher

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#9

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #12

Summons

4 #6

Summons

4 #4

Summons

4 #3

Summons

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

#1

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: 10-12 days. JURY TRIAL is set for 8/29/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 13106 before Judge Richard A. Jones. Joinder of Parties due by 8/16/2021, Amended Pleadings due by 3/2/2022, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/2/2022, Discovery completed by 5/2/2022, Dispositive motions and motions challenging expert witness testimony due by 5/31/2022, Motions in Limine due by 8/1/2022, Pretrial Order due by 8/15/2022, Trial briefs, proposed jury instructions, proposed voir dire, agreed neutral statement of the case, deposition designations, and trial exhibits to be submitted by 8/22/2022, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 10-12. (Grant, Beverly) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Damages by Glen Ceridono, Michael Holt, Christina Jones, Legacy Partners Inc, Syhadley LLC, Syres Properties, Joseph Syufy, Syufy Enterprises LP, Sywest Development.(Fletcher, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Syhadley LLC, Syres Properties, Syufy Enterprises LP, Sywest Development (Fletcher, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Legacy Partners Inc (Fletcher, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Upon Defendants' unopposed request, the following deadlines are reset: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/22/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/29/2021, Joint Status Report due by 7/6/2021. (VE) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MINUTE ORDER (text only) granting Defendants' Unopposed #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for Damages. Defendants shall file their responsive pleadings no later than 6/30/2021. Authorized by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kathryn P Fletcher on behalf of Defendants Glen Ceridono, Michael Holt, Christina Jones, Legacy Partners Inc, Syhadley LLC, Syres Properties, Joseph Syufy, Syufy Enterprises LP, Sywest Development. (Fletcher, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for Damages, filed by Defendants Glen Ceridono, Michael Holt, Christina Jones, Legacy Partners Inc, Syhadley LLC, Syres Properties, Joseph Syufy, Syufy Enterprises LP, Sywest Development. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/11/2021, (Byergo, Anthony) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REGARDING FRCP 26(f) CONFERENCE, INITIAL DISCLOSURES, AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/15/2021, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/22/2021, Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2021, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anthony B Byergo on behalf of Defendants Glen Ceridono, Michael Holt, Christina Jones, Legacy Partners Inc, Syhadley LLC, Syres Properties, Joseph Syufy, Syufy Enterprises LP, Sywest Development. (Byergo, Anthony) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Glen Ceridono, Michael Holt, Christina Jones, Legacy Partners Inc, Syhadley LLC, Syres Properties, Joseph Syufy, Syufy Enterprises LP, Sywest Development. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(RE) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketJudge Richard A. Jones added. (RE) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Addie Smith (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)(Grant, Beverly) (Main Document 3 replaced due to flattening of malformed PDF on 5/11/2021) (STP). (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint ; filed by Plaintiff Addie Smith. (Grant, Beverly) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7080393) Attorney Beverly G Grant added to party Addie Smith(pty:pla), filed by Addie Smith.(Grant, Beverly) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less