This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/02/2019 at 07:55:22 (UTC).

Smith v. Lee County Detention Center Staff et al (INMATE 2)

Case Summary

On 02/01/2019 Smith filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Lee County Detention Center Staff INMATE 2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles S. Coody and W. Harold Albritton, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00095

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles S. Coody

Presiding Judge

W. Harold Albritton, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Zackary Steven Smith

Opelika, AL 36803

Defendants

Lee County Detention Center Medical Staff

Lee County Detention Center Staff

Lt. Jones

Jay Jones

Dr. Eason

Captain Welch

Dr. Estep

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint & order of procedure signed by Rod Tabb for Jay Jones served on 3/5/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (djy, ) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#10

(#10) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint & order of procedure signed by Rod Tabb for Dr. Eason served on 3/5/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (djy, ) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#9

(#9) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint & order of procedure signed by Rod Tabb for Captain Welch served on 3/5/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (djy, ) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#8

(#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint & order of procedure signed by Rod Tabb for Dr. Estep served on 3/5/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (djy, ) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#7

(#7) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint & order of procedure signed by Rod Tabb for Lt. Jones served on 3/5/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (djy, ) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 4/12/2019, as further set out in order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named defendants. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/1/19. (djy, ) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER ON MOTION granting #2 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until $350.00 fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Lee County Detention Center. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/1/19. Furnished to cashier. (djy, ) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

#4

(#4) AMENDED Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Captain Welch, Lt. Jones, Dr. Estep, Dr. Eason, Jay Jones, filed by Zackary Steven Smith.(djy, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER directing that on or before 2/27/2019, plf shall file an amended complaint, as further set out in order; advising plf that this case will proceed only against the defendants named and claims presented in the amended complaint. The amended complaint will, therefore, supercede the original complaint; directing the clerk to provide him with a copy of the form used by prisoners to file 1983 complaints, and Plaintiff shall use this form in filing his amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 2/13/19. Mailed to plf with complaint form, as directed.(djy, ) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Zackary Steven Smith. (es, ) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#1

(#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Lee County Detention Center Medical Staff, Lee County Detention Center Staff, filed by Zackary Steven Smith.(es, ) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint & order of procedure signed by Rod Tabb for Jay Jones served on 3/5/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (djy, ) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint & order of procedure signed by Rod Tabb for Dr. Eason served on 3/5/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (djy, ) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint & order of procedure signed by Rod Tabb for Captain Welch served on 3/5/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (djy, ) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint & order of procedure signed by Rod Tabb for Dr. Estep served on 3/5/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (djy, ) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return Receipt Card showing service of complaint & order of procedure signed by Rod Tabb for Lt. Jones served on 3/5/2019, answer due 4/12/2019. (djy, ) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO FILE SPECIAL REPORT AND ANSWER on or before 4/12/2019, as further set out in order; copies mailed to plaintiff; mailed by CMRRR with complaint to named defendants. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/1/19. (djy, ) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER ON MOTION granting #2 motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; Directing Monthly Payments be made from Inmate's Prison Account until $350.00 fee is paid in full; Copies mailed to plaintiff and account clerk @ Lee County Detention Center. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/1/19. Furnished to cashier. (djy, ) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Captain Welch, Lt. Jones, Dr. Estep, Dr. Eason, Jay Jones, filed by Zackary Steven Smith.(djy, ) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER directing that on or before 2/27/2019, plf shall file an amended complaint, as further set out in order; advising plf that this case will proceed only against the defendants named and claims presented in the amended complaint. The amended complaint will, therefore, supercede the original complaint; directing the clerk to provide him with a copy of the form used by prisoners to file 1983 complaints, and Plaintiff shall use this form in filing his amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 2/13/19. Mailed to plf with complaint form, as directed.(djy, ) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Zackary Steven Smith. (es, ) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Lee County Detention Center Medical Staff, Lee County Detention Center Staff, filed by Zackary Steven Smith.(es, ) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less