This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/06/2020 at 08:54:56 (UTC).

SMITH v. KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 SMITH filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00227

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MELISSA SMITH

Defendant

KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Amber K. Boyd

Attorney at AMBER K. BOYD ATTORNEY AT LAW

8510 Evergreen Ave.

Indianapolis, IN 46240

Defendant Attorneys

Steven F. Pockrass

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Tiaundra Marie Foster

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 01:00 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/11/2019.(JRB) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Foster, Tiaundra) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiaundra Marie Foster on behalf of Defendant KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Foster, Tiaundra) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Pockrass, Steven) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven F. Pockrass on behalf of Defendant KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Pockrass, Steven) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC. (JRB) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Amber K. Boyd on behalf of Plaintiff MELISSA SMITH. (Boyd, Amber) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Proposed Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC., filed by MELISSA SMITH. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5714836) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boyd, Amber) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 01:00 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 12/11/2019.(JRB) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Foster, Tiaundra) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Tiaundra Marie Foster on behalf of Defendant KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Foster, Tiaundra) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Pockrass, Steven) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven F. Pockrass on behalf of Defendant KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC.. (Pockrass, Steven) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC. (JRB) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Amber K. Boyd on behalf of Plaintiff MELISSA SMITH. (Boyd, Amber) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC., filed by MELISSA SMITH. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5714836) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boyd, Amber) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KIMBALL ELECTRONICS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven F. Pockrass

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tiaundra Marie Foster