This case was last updated from PACER on 08/14/2021 at 09:20:49 (UTC).

Smith v. K.B.R., Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 Smith filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against K B R , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony W. Ishii and Stanley A. Boone. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00940

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anthony W. Ishii

Referral Judge

Stanley A. Boone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mckennah Smith

Defendant

K.B.R., Inc. Doing business as Rash Curtis & Associates

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Adrian R. Bacon

Attorney at Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.

21550 Oxnard St., Suite 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Todd M. Friedman

Attorney at Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.

21550 Oxnard St., Suite 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorney

Amanda Nicole Griffith

Attorney at Berman Berman Berman Schneider & Lowary, Llp

2390 Professional Drive

Roseville, CA 95661

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case and Adjust the Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/03/2021. CASE CLOSED. (Maldonado, C) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. SEVEN DAY DEADLINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/21/2021(Hernandez, M) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

10 #1

Proposed Order

10 #10

Main Document

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by K.B.R., Inc.. (Griffith, Amanda) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER by K.B.R., Inc..(Griffith, Amanda) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

5 #2

VDRP

5 #1

Consent Form

#5

(#5) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by K.B.R., Inc. dba Rash Curtis & Associates. (Griffith, Amanda) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

2 #1

Exhibit

#2

(#2) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno County Superior, case number 21CECL03994 by K.B.R., Inc. dba Rash Curtis & Associates. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9653556) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Griffith, Amanda) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by K.B.R., Inc. dba Rash Curtis & Associates (Griffith, Amanda) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Close Case and Adjust the Docket to Reflect Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/03/2021. CASE CLOSED. (Maldonado, C) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for dismissal of the entire action with prejudice by Mckennah Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 07/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by K.B.R., Inc.. (Griffith, Amanda) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER by K.B.R., Inc..(Griffith, Amanda) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. SEVEN DAY DEADLINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/21/2021(Hernandez, M) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Griffith, Amanda) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by K.B.R., Inc. dba Rash Curtis & Associates. (Griffith, Amanda) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno County Superior, case number 21CECL03994 by K.B.R., Inc. dba Rash Curtis & Associates. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9653556) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Griffith, Amanda) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by K.B.R., Inc. dba Rash Curtis & Associates (Griffith, Amanda) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KBR Inc. dba Rash Curtis & Associates is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adrian Robert Bacon