This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:14:23 (UTC).

Smith v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability case was filed by Smith against Johnson Johnson in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-17043

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Lois H. Goodman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda L Smith

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Linda L Smith. JOHNSON & JOHNSON waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019; JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#2

(#2) MULTIDISTRICT CONDITIONAL LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER transferring the action to the District of New Jersey Signed by John W. Nichols on 8/15/19. (MD) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

3 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-01013. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3539330, filed by Linda L Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

4 #1

Certificate of Service

#4

(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT (SHORT FORM COMPLAINT) against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC, filed by Linda L Smith. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by JESSICA LEIGH BRENNAN on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (BRENNAN, JESSICA) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Linda L Smith. JOHNSON & JOHNSON waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019; JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT (SHORT FORM COMPLAINT) against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC, filed by Linda L Smith. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GOLDSTEIN, BRIAN) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 1:19-cv-01013. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MULTIDISTRICT CONDITIONAL LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER transferring the action to the District of New Jersey Signed by John W. Nichols on 8/15/19. (MD) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3539330, filed by Linda L Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Brian) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.