This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:37:45 (UTC).

SMITH v. JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 SMITH filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert B. Kugler and Joel Schneider. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-17156

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert B. Kugler

Referral Judge

Joel Schneider

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Lead Plaintiff

MYEKA SMITH

Defendants and Cross Claimants

CONSOLIDATED ASSET RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC

701 Corporate Center Dr, #163

Raleigh, NC 27607

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

16 Mccleland Rd

St Cloud, MN 56303

ASSET SOLUTIONS RECOVERY LLC

957 Sicklerville Rd

Sicklerville, NJ 08081

Defendants and Cross Defendants

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

16 Mccleland Rd

St Cloud, MN 56303

ASSET SOLUTIONS RECOVERY LLC

957 Sicklerville Rd

Sicklerville, NJ 08081

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Lead Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL F NIZNIK, JR

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL F. NIZNIK

1500 Walnut St. Ste. 900

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

DANTE C. ROHR

Attorney at MARSHALL, DENNEHEY, WARNER, COLEMAN & GOGGIN, PC

15000 Midlantic Drive, P. O. Box 5429, Suite 200

Mt. Laurel, NJ 08054

AARON RAPHAEL EASLEY

Attorney at SESSIONS, FISHMAN, NATHAN & ISRAEL, LLC

3 Cross Creek Drive

Flemington, NJ 08822-4938

MICHAEL T. SWEENEY

Attorney at Sessions, Fishman, Nathan & Israel

1111 Manning Street

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

AARON RAPHAEL EASLEY

Attorney at SESSIONS, FISHMAN, NATHAN & ISRAEL, LLC

3 Cross Creek Drive

Flemington, NJ 08822-4938

MICHAEL T. SWEENEY

Attorney at Sessions, Fishman, Nathan & Israel

1111 Manning Street

Philadelphia, PA 19107

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Certificate of Service

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ASSET SOLUTIONS RECOVERY LLC, JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC by CONSOLIDATED ASSET RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROHR, DANTE) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL T. SWEENEY on behalf of JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC (SWEENEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#10

(#10) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The initial conference currently scheduled for October 16, 2019 is hereby rescheduled to October 24, 2019 at 3:30 p.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/9/2019. (rtm, ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#9

(#9) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Consolidated Asset Recovery Systems, Inc... (ROHR, DANTE) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

8 #1

Certificate of Service

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by DANTE C. ROHR on behalf of CONSOLIDATED ASSET RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROHR, DANTE) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

#7

(#7) Joint Discovery Plan by MYEKA SMITH.(NIZNIK, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER Denying request to postpone the 10/16/2019 conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/2/2019. (rtm, ) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

#5

(#5) Order Initial Conference set for 10/16/2019 10:30 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/18/2019. (rtm, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC identifying CL Holdings, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (EASLEY, AARON) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint by JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC.(EASLEY, AARON) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASSET SOLUTIONS RECOVERY LLC, CONSOLIDATED ASSET RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC, JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ASSET SOLUTIONS RECOVERY LLC, CONSOLIDATED ASSET RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC, JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916506) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MYEKA SMITH.(NIZNIK, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against ASSET SOLUTIONS RECOVERY LLC, JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC by CONSOLIDATED ASSET RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROHR, DANTE) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL T. SWEENEY on behalf of JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC (SWEENEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CONSOLIDATED ASSET RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/29/2019. (rtm, ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: The initial conference currently scheduled for October 16, 2019 is hereby rescheduled to October 24, 2019 at 3:30 p.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/9/2019. (rtm, ) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Consolidated Asset Recovery Systems, Inc... (ROHR, DANTE) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by DANTE C. ROHR on behalf of CONSOLIDATED ASSET RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ROHR, DANTE) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Joint Discovery Plan by MYEKA SMITH.(NIZNIK, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Denying request to postpone the 10/16/2019 conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 10/2/2019. (rtm, ) (Entered: 10/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Initial Conference set for 10/16/2019 10:30 AM in Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 9/18/2019. (rtm, ) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC identifying CL Holdings, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (EASLEY, AARON) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint by JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC.(EASLEY, AARON) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASSET SOLUTIONS RECOVERY LLC, CONSOLIDATED ASSET RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC, JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ssp, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against ASSET SOLUTIONS RECOVERY LLC, CONSOLIDATED ASSET RECOVERY SYSTEMS INC, JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9916506) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MYEKA SMITH.(NIZNIK, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.