This case was last updated from PACER on 09/24/2019 at 06:21:03 (UTC).

Smith v. Intermountain Healthcare, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2019 a Labor - Employee Benefit case was filed by Smith against Intermountain Healthcare, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Utah District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00670

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Evelyn J. Furse

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda Smith

Defendants

Intermountain Healthcare, Inc

SelectHealth

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Linda Smith is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#23) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Intermountain Healthcare, Inc answer due 12/13/2019; SelectHealth answer due 12/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/21/2019. (nl) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney D. Brian Hufford and Jason S. Cowart, for Plaintiff Linda Smith. (nl) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Meiram Bendat, for Plaintiff Linda Smith. (nl) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Andrew N. Goldfarb, for Plaintiff Linda Smith. (nl) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 09/24/2019. (nl) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Linda Smith as to Intermountain Healthcare, Inc Waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Egan, Austin) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Linda Smith as to SelectHealth Waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Egan, Austin) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#23

(#23) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Intermountain Healthcare, Inc answer due 12/13/2019; SelectHealth answer due 12/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/21/2019. (nl) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#22

(#22) MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Intermountain Healthcare, Inc, SelectHealth. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiFrancesco, Lauren) Modified on 11/21/2019 to correct event Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (nl). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

22 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#20

(#20) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Intermountain Healthcare, Inc, SelectHealth. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Lauren E.H. DiFrancesco added to party Intermountain Healthcare, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren E.H. DiFrancesco added to party SelectHealth(pty:dft)(DiFrancesco, Lauren) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

20 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Motion to Transfer Case by Linda Smith (Egan, Austin) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#15

(#15) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason Cowart , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3396680, filed by Plaintiff Linda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Egan, Austin) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

15 #3

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

15 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint. Answer deadline updated for Intermountain Healthcare, Inc answer due 12/13/2019; SelectHealth answer due 12/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/21/2019. (nl) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Intermountain Healthcare, Inc, SelectHealth. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DiFrancesco, Lauren) Modified on 11/21/2019 to correct event Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (nl). (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) DOCKET TEXT ORDER denying #20 Motion for Extension of Time for failure to establish good cause for the extension. If the parties seek to extend the time for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint, they must comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1) ("When an act may or must be done within a specified time, the court may, for good cause, extend the time with or without motion or notice if the court acts, or if a request is made, before the original time or its extension expires; or on motion made after the time has expired if the party failed to act because of excusable neglect."). Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 11/21/2019. No attached document. (ang) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Intermountain Healthcare, Inc, SelectHealth. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Attorney Lauren E.H. DiFrancesco added to party Intermountain Healthcare, Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren E.H. DiFrancesco added to party SelectHealth(pty:dft)(DiFrancesco, Lauren) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Motion to Transfer Case by Linda Smith (Egan, Austin) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason S. Cowart for Linda Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/18/2019. (nl) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew N. Goldfarb for Linda Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/18/2019. (nl) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of D. Brian Hufford for Linda Smith. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at http://www.utd.uscourts.gov Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/18/2019. (nl) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jason Cowart , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3396680, filed by Plaintiff Linda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Egan, Austin) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Goldfarb , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3396659, filed by Plaintiff Linda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - ECF Registration, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Egan, Austin) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DOCKET TEXT ORDER: The #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meiram Bendat does not include a copy of the required pro hac vice application. Exhibits A and B to the motion are copies of the same ECF registration form. Plaintiff must file a copy of the application. The Motion will not be addressed until a copy of the application is received. No attached document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 10/11/2019. (nas) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Meiram Bendat , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number 1088-3393691, filed by Plaintiff Linda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pro Hac Vice Application, #2 Exhibit ECF Regisration)(Egan, Austin) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Linda Smith as to SelectHealth Waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Egan, Austin) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Linda Smith as to Intermountain Healthcare, Inc Waiver sent on 9/23/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Egan, Austin) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 09/24/2019. (nl) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Andrew N. Goldfarb, for Plaintiff Linda Smith. (nl) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Meiram Bendat, for Plaintiff Linda Smith. (nl) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney D. Brian Hufford and Jason S. Cowart, for Plaintiff Linda Smith. (nl) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3378455) filed by Linda Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse (Egan, Austin) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse. Plaintiff Linda Smith is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nl) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.