This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:15:54 (UTC).

SMITH v. HUMPHREY et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 SMITH filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against HUMPHREY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Doris L. Pryor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04950

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MYKEL EZRA SMITH

Bunker Hill, IN 46914-9810

Respondents

PAUL HUMPHREY

INDIANAPOLIS METROPOLITAN POLICE DEPARTMENT

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#1

(#1) CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by MYKEL EZRA SMITH located at MIAMI CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by MYKEL EZRA SMITH to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (REO) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Petitioner MYKEL EZRA SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(REO) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

5 #1

2254 form

#2

(#2) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MYKEL EZRA SMITH. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

(#5) Entry - Mykel Smith filed a habeas corpus petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 challenging his conviction under Indiana state cause number 49G02-1510-F2- 037383. The clerk is directed to send Mr. Smith a copy of the 28 U.S.C. 2254 habeas corpus petition form. Mr. Smith shall submit the form by January 21, 2020. If Mr. Smith submits the form, the district court will proceed with screening his petition. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 12/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 2254 form)(RSF) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#6

(#6) Order Denying Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis - Petitioner Mykel Smith's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #3 , is denied as presented. Mr. Smith states he does not have the means to pay the $5.00 filing fee, but he does not support his application with a current inmate trust account statement. Mr. Smith has through January 23, 2020, to either pay the filing fee or submit a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with a current trust fund account statement. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 12/27/2019. (JDH) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Denying Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis - Petitioner Mykel Smith's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, dkt. #3 , is denied as presented. Mr. Smith states he does not have the means to pay the $5.00 filing fee, but he does not support his application with a current inmate trust account statement. Mr. Smith has through January 23, 2020, to either pay the filing fee or submit a renewed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis with a current trust fund account statement. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 12/27/2019. (JDH) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry - Mykel Smith filed a habeas corpus petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254 challenging his conviction under Indiana state cause number 49G02-1510-F2- 037383. The clerk is directed to send Mr. Smith a copy of the 28 U.S.C. 2254 habeas corpus petition form. Mr. Smith shall submit the form by January 21, 2020. If Mr. Smith submits the form, the district court will proceed with screening his petition. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 12/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 2254 form)(RSF) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Petitioner MYKEL EZRA SMITH. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(REO) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by MYKEL EZRA SMITH. (No fee paid with this filing) (REO) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by MYKEL EZRA SMITH located at MIAMI CF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by MYKEL EZRA SMITH to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (REO) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.