This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2021 at 09:11:54 (UTC).

Smith v. Great West Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 Smith filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Great West Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02829

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Louis Smith

Defendant

Great West Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Anton Sirchio

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Defendant Attorneys

Lynn Rose Kuznitz

Attorney at Hall & Evans LLC-Denver

1001 Seventeenth Streetsuite 300

Denver, CO 80202

Stephanie A. Montague

Attorney at Hall & Evans LLC-Denver

1001 Seventeenth Streetsuite 300

Denver, CO 80202

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/22/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/26/2022. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 2/2/2022 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (alave, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lynn Rose Kuznitz on behalf of Great West Casualty CompanyAttorney Lynn Rose Kuznitz added to party Great West Casualty Company(pty:dft) (Kuznitz, Lynn) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Great West Casualty Company.(Montague, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/22/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02829-KLM. (trvo, ) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph Anton Sirchio on behalf of Louis SmithAttorney Joseph Anton Sirchio added to party Louis Smith(pty:pla) (Sirchio, Joseph) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, and CCCS upon Great West Casualty Company on 9/29/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Great West Casualty Company, filed by Louis Smith.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Great West Casualty Company from District Court Weld County, Case Number 2021cv30557. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8135231), filed by Great West Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Complaint, #3 Exhibit B Summons, #4 Exhibit C Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit D Affidavit of Service, #6 Exhibit E Order Case Management, #7 Exhibit F Current State Court Docket, #8 Exhibit G Notice of Notice of Removal)(Montague, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GREAT WEST CASUALTY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie A. Montague