This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2019 at 08:04:14 (UTC).

Smith v. General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 Smith filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Curtis L Collier and Christopher H Steger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00060

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Curtis L Collier

Referral Judge

Christopher H Steger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Steven Smith

Fayetteville, TN 37334

Defendant

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Clarence J Gideon, Jr

Attorney at Gideon, Cooper & Essary, PLC

315 Deaderick Street, Suite 1100

Nashville, TN 37238

Raymond W Fraley, Jr

Attorney at Fraley & Hill

205 Market St. East, P.O. Box 572

Fayetteville, TN 37334-0572

Defendant Attorneys

Amie A Vague

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White, LLC

The Clark Building, 400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Rachel M Lary

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White, LLC

The Clark Building, 400 20Th Street North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Thomas A Wiseman, III

Attorney at Wiseman, Ashworth Law Group PLC (Nashville)

511 Union Street, Suite 800

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by General Motors LLC (Vague, Amie) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#17

(#17) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Vague, Amie) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 09:00 AM in Chattanooga before District Judge Curtis L Collier. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020 04:00 PM in Chattanooga before District Judge Curtis L Collier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/22/19. (AWS) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A Wiseman, III on behalf of General Motors LLC (Wiseman, Thomas) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Clarence J Gideon, Jr on behalf of John Steven Smith (Gideon, Clarence) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#12

(#12) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4087256.) (Certificate of Good Standing Rachel Lary) filed by General Motors LLC. (Vague, Amie) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Rachel Lary re #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: PHV Requirements Deadline:10/15/2019. (AWS) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#10

(#11) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Rachel Lary re #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: PHV Requirements Deadline:10/15/2019. (AWS) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#6

(#6) Certificate of Corporate Interest by General Motors LLC. (Vague, Amie) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by General Motors LLC.(Vague, Amie) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#4

(#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/17/19. (ABF) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#3

(#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/17/19. (ABF) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/17/19. (ABF) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Other Cover Sheet

#1

(#7) Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Rachel Lary #1 Notice of Removal: requirements due by 10/3/2019. (AWS) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by General Motors LLC (Vague, Amie) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Vague, Amie) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 09:00 AM in Chattanooga before District Judge Curtis L Collier. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/29/2020 04:00 PM in Chattanooga before District Judge Curtis L Collier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee on 10/22/19. (AWS) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee: Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2019. Scheduling conference held in chambers without a court reporter or courtroom deputy. (CNC) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A Wiseman, III on behalf of General Motors LLC (Wiseman, Thomas) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Clarence J Gideon, Jr on behalf of John Steven Smith (Gideon, Clarence) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 9-27-19. (KMG) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by General Motors LLC. (AWS) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-4087256.) (Certificate of Good Standing Rachel Lary) filed by General Motors LLC. (Vague, Amie) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Rachel Lary re #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: PHV Requirements Deadline:10/15/2019. (AWS) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/18/19. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AWS) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Administrative Notice to Counsel as to Rachel Lary #1 Notice of Removal: requirements due by 10/3/2019. (AWS) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Certificate of Corporate Interest by General Motors LLC. (Vague, Amie) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by General Motors LLC.(Vague, Amie) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/17/19. (ABF) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/17/19. (ABF) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/17/19. (ABF) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Corporate Interest as required by FRCP 7.1 by General Motors LLC. (ABF) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger added. (ABF) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lincoln County, TN, case number 19-cv-80. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-4079899), filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Other Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Vague, Amie) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.