This case was last updated from PACER on 08/23/2021 at 07:03:27 (UTC).

Smith v. Frito-Lay North America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 Smith filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Frito-Lay North America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph C. Spero and Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-04863

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Joseph C. Spero

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ben Smith

Defendant

Frito-Lay North America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan Shub

Attorney at Shub Law Firm LLC

134 Kings Highway East, Second Floor

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

Kevin Laukaitis

Attorney at Shub Law Firm LLC

134 Kings Highway East, Second Floor

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

Spencer Sheehan

Attorney at Sheehan & Associates, P.C.

60 Cuttermill Road, Suite 409

Great Neck, NY 11021-1501

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING THE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 9/15/2021, PROVIDING ZOOM ACCESS, AND REQUIRING ADVANCE REGISTRATION OF COUNSEL. Case Management Statement due by 9/8/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov by Wednesday, September 8th, 2021, no later than 10:00AM.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (bxsS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2021) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • Docket(#9) REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2021, 02:00 PM, by Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/vc Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at vccrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than Thursday, September 16, 2021, by no later than 10:00 a.m.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2021) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 06/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2021) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/24/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/1/2021 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Frito-Lay North America, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ben Smith.. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/25/2021) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/8/2021. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/24/2021) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against Frito-Lay North America, Inc., (Filing Fee: $402.00, receipt number 0971-16110544). Filed by Ben Smith. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/24/2021) Modified on 6/25/2021 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Frito-Lay North America, Inc., is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Laukaitis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN SHUB

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Spencer Sheehan