Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/14/2021 at 10:29:00 (UTC).

Smith v. Covidien LP et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Smith filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Covidien LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Greg Gerard Guidry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00530

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Greg Gerard Guidry

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DERICK PAUL SMITH

Defendants

Medtronic, Inc.

Covidien LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer L. Crose

Attorney at Jim S. Hall & Associates

800 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 100

Metairie, LA 70001

Matthew B. Moreland

Attorney at Jim S. Hall & Associates

800 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 100

Metairie, LA 70001

Marc J. Mandich

Attorney at Southern Institute for Medical and Legal Affairs

2224 1St Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

Jim S. Hall

Attorney at Jim S. Hall & Associates

800 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 100

Metairie, LA 70001

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole M. Boyer

Attorney at Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Pfister, Weinstock & Bogart

Three Lakeway Center, 3838 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

Kelly Cambre Bogart

Attorney at Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Pfister, Weinstock & Bogart

Three Lakeway Center, 3838 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Covidien LP answer due 5/28/2021. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/03/2021. (ko) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint by Covidien LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Nicole M. Boyer added to party Covidien LP(pty:dft).(Boyer, Nicole) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Covidien LP served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Crose, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Medtronic, Inc. served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Crose, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(bm) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

1 #3

Summons Covidien Summons

1 #2

Summons Medtronic Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8775797) filed by Derick Paul Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Medtronic Summons, #3 Summons Covidien Summons)Attorney Jennifer L. Crose added to party Derick Paul Smith (pty:pla).(Crose, Jennifer) Modified text on 3/16/2021 (bm). (Entered: 03/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Covidien LP answer due 5/28/2021. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/03/2021. (ko) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead re #1 Complaint by Covidien LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Nicole M. Boyer added to party Covidien LP(pty:dft).(Boyer, Nicole) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Covidien LP served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Crose, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Medtronic, Inc. served on 4/16/2021, answer due 5/7/2021. (Crose, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Covidien LP, Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(bm) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (aj) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8775797) filed by Derick Paul Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Medtronic Summons, #3 Summons Covidien Summons)Attorney Jennifer L. Crose added to party Derick Paul Smith (pty:pla).(Crose, Jennifer) Modified text on 3/16/2021 (bm). (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COVIDIEN LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole Marie Boyer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kelly Cambre Bogart