Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/22/2020 at 08:36:15 (UTC).

Smith v. Commvault Systems, inc.

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Smith filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Commvault Systems, inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Graham Mullen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00531

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Graham Mullen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marshall Smith

Defendant

Commvault Systems, inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Julie H. Fosbinder

Attorney at Fosbinder Law Office

501 East Morehead Street, Suite 1

Charlotte, NC 28202

Defendant Attorneys

Jerry Howard Walters, Jr.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

100 North Tryon Street, Suite 4150

Charlotte, NC 28202

Douglas Alan Albritton

Attorney at Actuate Law LLC

641 West Lake Street, 5Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60661

Jeffrey Michael Hansen

Attorney at Actuate Law LLC

641 West Lake Street, 5Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60661

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: four (4) to five (5) days. Discovery due by 6/18/2021. Motions due by 6/19/2021. Mediation deadline set for 6/4/2021. Jury Trial set for 11/15/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/20/2020. (eef) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Hansen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 & #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Douglas Alan Albritton,Jeffrey Michael Hansen for Commvault Systems, inc.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/6/2020. (eef) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Douglas Alan Albritton Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4698912. by Commvault Systems, inc.. (Walters, Jerry) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey Michael Hansen Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4698884. by Commvault Systems, inc.. (Walters, Jerry) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Commvault Systems, inc..(Walters, Jerry) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Commvault Systems, inc. (Walters, Jerry) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Howard Walters, Jr on behalf of Commvault Systems, inc. (Walters, Jerry) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Cover Sheet Civil Coversheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from North Carolina Superior Court of Union County, case number 20CVS001017. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4683635), filed by Commvault Systems, inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Walters, Jerry) Modified duplicate text on 9/24/2020 (brj). Modified text on 9/25/2020 (rth). (Entered: 09/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: four (4) to five (5) days. Discovery due by 6/18/2021. Motions due by 6/19/2021. Mediation deadline set for 6/4/2021. Jury Trial set for 11/15/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/20/2020. (eef) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Hansen, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNotice to Jeffrey Michael Hansen: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/13/2020. (eef) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 & #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Douglas Alan Albritton,Jeffrey Michael Hansen for Commvault Systems, inc.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/6/2020. (eef) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Douglas Alan Albritton Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4698912. by Commvault Systems, inc.. (Walters, Jerry) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey Michael Hansen Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4698884. by Commvault Systems, inc.. (Walters, Jerry) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 10/21/2020. (brj) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Commvault Systems, inc..(Walters, Jerry) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDeleted Entry. Entered in error. (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDeleted Entry. Entered in error. 9/29/2020 (eef). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Commvault Systems, inc. (Walters, Jerry) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Howard Walters, Jr on behalf of Commvault Systems, inc. (Walters, Jerry) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from North Carolina Superior Court of Union County, case number 20CVS001017. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4683635), filed by Commvault Systems, inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Walters, Jerry) Modified duplicate text on 9/24/2020 (brj). Modified text on 9/25/2020 (rth). (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Commvault Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas Alan Albritton(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jerry Howard Walters, Jr.