This case was last updated from PACER on 06/20/2020 at 10:59:12 (UTC).

Smith v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 04/21/2020 Smith filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher C. Bly and Leigh Martin May. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01680

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher C. Bly

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Janie Smith

Defendant

Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kathleen Marie Flynn

Attorney at Law Offices of Kathleen M. Flynn

Suite 940, 315 West Ponce De Leon Ave.

Decatur, GA 30030

Ida Comerford

Attorney at Law Offices of Kenneth Hiller, PLLC

Suite 1A, 6000 N. Bailey Avenue

Amherst, NY 14226

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (eop) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotification of Docket Correction re #7 Affidavit of Service as to Social Security Administration by Janie Smith. (Hiller, Kenneth) Modified on 6/18/2020 to edit event(tmf). (tmf) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Affidavit of Service as to Social Security Administration by Janie Smith. (Hiller, Kenneth) Modified on 6/18/2020 to edit event(tmf). (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Ida Comerford on behalf of Janie Smith (Comerford, Ida) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (mmc) (ADI) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/20. (eop) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Commissioner, Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Attorney General, #2 U. S. Attorney)(eop) Modified Issued Date on 4/22/2020 (eop). (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Janie Smith. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number AGANDC-9611911) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A, #2 Exhibit -B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified file date on 4/22/2020 (eop). (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less