This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/20/2021 at 08:52:06 (UTC).

Smith v. Collecto, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 Smith filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Collecto, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Irene C. Berger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00352

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Irene C. Berger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles S. Smith

Defendants

Cellco Partnership doing business as Verizon Wireless

TransUnion LLC

Collecto, Inc. doing business as EOS CCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jed Robert Nolan

Attorney at NOLAN CONSUMER LAW

P. O. Box 654

Athens, WV 24712

Robert M. Bastress, III

Attorney at DITRAPANO BARRETT & DIPIERO

P. O. Box 1631

Charleston, WV 25301

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Rothenberg

Attorney at SCHUCKIT & ASSOCIATES

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

Robert Edward Ryan

Attorney at STEPTOE & JOHNSON

P. O. Box 1616

Morgantown, WV 26507-1616

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Summons Issued as to Cellco Partnership

#6

#7

#8

#9

#11

#12

#13

#14

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER AND NOTICE: Motions under FR Civ P 12(b) - 9/9/2021. Last day for Rule 26(f) meeting - 9/16/2021. Last day to file Report of Parties' Planning Meeting and Scheduling Order Worksheet - 9/23/2021. Scheduling Conference at 3:00 PM in Charleston, West Virginia on 10/7/2021, before the undersigned, unless cancelled. Entry of Scheduling Order - 10/14/2021. Last day to serve FR Civ P 26(a)(1) initial disclosures pre-discovery - 10/21/2021. Signed by Judge Irene C. Berger on 8/16/2021. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (mfo)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to #1 Complaint by TransUnion LLC; Jury demand. (Ryan, Robert)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #10 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Incorrect event used and duplicate of entry #12. CORRECTION: Image removed; see entry #12. (kew)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STATEMENT OF VISITING ATTORNEY from Daniel Rothenberg on behalf of TransUnion LLC. Local counsel: Robert Edward Ryan. Fee $50.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8008613. (Ryan, Robert)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant TransUnion LLC (Ryan, Robert)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • Docket(#10) DUPLICATE IMAGE; SEE ENTRY #12. (Modified on 8/11/2021 to remove duplicate image) (kew).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to TransUnion LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (kew)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Charles S. Smith for TransUnion LLC, re: #1 Complaint. (Bastress, Robert)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 7/13/2021 as to Collecto, Inc. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100003143301. (mk)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 7/13/2021 as to Cellco Partnership. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100003143318. (mk)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cellco Partnership, Collecto, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Summons Issued as to Cellco Partnership) (kew)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Charles S. Smith for Cellco Partnership, re: #1 Complaint. (Bastress, Robert)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS SUBMITTED by Charles S. Smith for Collecto, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. (Bastress, Robert)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER FOR ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES OF CIVIL ACTIONS ASSIGNED TO JUDGE IRENE C. BERGER ENTERED NOVEMBER 12, 2019. This matter referred to Magistrate Judge Aboulhosn for Discovery. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (klc)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCASE assigned to Judge Irene C. Berger. (klc) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $402.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-7972103. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mms) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less