This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2023 at 07:56:35 (UTC).

Smith v. Circle K Inc. et al (MAG+)

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Smith filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Circle K Inc MAG. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Myron H. Thompson and Stephen Michael Doyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00022

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Myron H. Thompson

Referral Judge

Stephen Michael Doyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peter J. Smith

Montgomery, AL 36102-1644

Defendants

Circle K Inc.

Amy Willard

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Circle K Inc., Amy Willard, filed by Peter J. Smith. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 4/10/2023.(es, ) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Peter J. Smith. (es, ) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#3

(#3) ORDER: it is ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, this case is referred to the United States Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/11/2023. (am, ) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: it is ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636, this case is referred to the United States Magistrate Judge for consideration and disposition or recommendation on all pretrial matters as may be appropriate. Signed by Honorable Judge Myron H. Thompson on 1/11/2023. (am, ) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Peter J. Smith. (es, ) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Circle K Inc., Amy Willard, filed by Peter J. Smith. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 4/10/2023.(es, ) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less