This case was last updated from PACER on 09/08/2021 at 07:05:40 (UTC).

Smith v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 Smith filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy J. Corrigan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00878

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy J. Corrigan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodney Smith

Defendants

C R Bard Incorporated

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arati C. Furness

Attorney at Fears Nachawati, PLLC

5473 Blair Rd

Dallas, TX 75231

Matthew R. McCarley

Attorney at Law Office of Andrew L. Jones, P.C.

2708 Fairmount #100

Dallas, TX 75201

Rebecca S. Vinocur

Attorney at Rebecca S. Vinocur, PA

5915 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ste 14

Coral Gables, FL 33146-2435

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough, LLP

201 17Th St Nw Ste 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Sabrina R. Gallo

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 4400

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER re Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to claims of certain plaintiffs, with directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 8/31/2021. (LRB) (Originally filed in 3:21-mc-11-TJC) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#7

(#7) JOINT Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (LRB) (Originally filed in 3:21-mc-11-TJC) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

6 #2

Exhibit B - List of Cases

6 #1

Exhibit A - Amended Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order (Fifth)

#6

(#6) ORDER directing the parties to confer and file one joint statement per case regarding venue, including the specific divisions, no later than April 1, 2021. Defendant's counsel is responsible to ensure that the responses are docketed in CM/ECF in this miscellaneous case as directed. See order for further detail. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order (Fifth), #2 Exhibit B - List of Cases)(LRB) (Originally filed in 3:21-mc-11-TJC) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01894. File received electronically (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#4

(#4) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/7/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

#3

(#3) *AMENDED By Doc. #4*SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/16/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 9/7/2021.] (Entered: 02/10/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16687327 filed by Rodney Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/7/2021.] (Entered: 03/25/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER re Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to claims of certain plaintiffs, with directions to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 8/31/2021. (LRB) (Originally filed in 3:21-mc-11-TJC) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JOINT Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (LRB) (Originally filed in 3:21-mc-11-TJC) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER directing the parties to confer and file one joint statement per case regarding venue, including the specific divisions, no later than April 1, 2021. Defendant's counsel is responsible to ensure that the responses are docketed in CM/ECF in this miscellaneous case as directed. See order for further detail. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Corrigan on 3/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Suggestion of Remand and Transfer Order (Fifth), #2 Exhibit B - List of Cases)(LRB) (Originally filed in 3:21-mc-11-TJC) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01894. File received electronically (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Middle District of Florida via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/7/2021.] (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/11/2021. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/7/2021.] (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) *AMENDED By Doc. #4*SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (FIFTH). See Order for Complete Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 2/9/2021. (MAP) *Modified on 2/16/2021 (MAP). [Transferred from azd on 9/7/2021.] (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-1894-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/7/2021.] (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16687327 filed by Rodney Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) [Transferred from azd on 9/7/2021.] (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sabrina R. Gallo