This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 10:59:23 (UTC).

Smith v. Butts Foods, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 Smith filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Butts Foods, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are S. Thomas Anderson and Jon A. York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01060

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Thomas Anderson

Referral Judge

Jon A. York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Richard Smith

Defendants

R.E. Butts

Butts Foods, Inc.

Ray Butts, III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gordon E. Jackson

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER DISMISSING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 7/2/19. (mbm) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Smith. Ray Butts, III waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Jackson, Gordon) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Smith. R.E. Butts waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Jackson, Gordon) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Smith. Butts Foods, Inc. waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Jackson, Gordon) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Richard Smith. (Jackson, Gordon) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 7/1/19. (cdi) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

#7

(#7) Modified on 5/29/2019 per chambers request, document applied to case 18-1235 only (skp). (Main Document 7 replaced on 5/29/2019) (skp). (Entered: 05/28/2019)

6 #2

Summons R. E. Butts

6 #1

Summons R. Butts III

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Butts Foods, Inc., R.E. Butts, and Ray Butts, III. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons R. Butts III, #2 Summons R. E. Butts)(skc) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#2

(#2) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

1 #4

Summons to be issued

1 #3

Summons to be issued

1 #2

Summons to be issued

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3024743), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to be issued, #3 Summons to be issued, #4 Summons to be issued)(Jackson, Gordon) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER DISMISSING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 7/2/19. (mbm) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Smith. Ray Butts, III waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Jackson, Gordon) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Smith. R.E. Butts waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Jackson, Gordon) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard Smith. Butts Foods, Inc. waiver sent on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Jackson, Gordon) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Richard Smith. (Jackson, Gordon) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 7/1/19. (cdi) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Modified on 5/29/2019 per chambers request, document applied to case 18-1235 only (skp). (Main Document 7 replaced on 5/29/2019) (skp). (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Butts Foods, Inc., R.E. Butts, and Ray Butts, III. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 Summons R. Butts III, #2 Summons R. E. Butts)(skc) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (skc) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (skc) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (skc) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jon A. York added. (skc) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3024743), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to be issued, #3 Summons to be issued, #4 Summons to be issued)(Jackson, Gordon) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.