This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/29/2019 at 07:53:38 (UTC).

SMITH v BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INCet al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP EXPLORATION PRODUCTION INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and GARY R JONES. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-03603

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

XAVIER SMITH

Defendants

BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC

BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOWARD L NATIONS

Attorney at HOWARD L NATIONS PC - HOUSTON TX

3131 Briarpark Drive, Suite 208

Houston, TX 77042-3795

Defendant Attorneys

KEVIN MICHAEL HODGES

Attorney at WILLIAMS & CONNOLLY LLP - WASHINGTON DC

725 12Th St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR

Attorney at MCDONALD TOOLE WIGGINS PA - ORLANDO FL

111 N Magnolia Ave, Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #3

BELO Settlement Agreement

#4

#5

#6

#7

7 #1

*Restricted*

#8

#9

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC. (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR on behalf of BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY, BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION INC (MCDONALD, FRANCIS) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-09852. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Florida. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 9/27/2019. (NEF: Section J) (sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/30/2019.] (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/30/2019.] (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/30/2019.] (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No.'s 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/30/2019.] (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (gk) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/30/2019.] (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7607607) filed by Xavier Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Xavier Smith(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 9/30/2019.] (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRANCIS M MCDONALD, JR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin Michael *Hodges-TRANSFER ATTORNEY