Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/06/2020 at 09:06:07 (UTC).

SMITH v. ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS D. SCHROEDER, JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE, JOE L. WEBSTER and LORETTA C. BIGGS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00921

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

THOMAS D. SCHROEDER

LORETTA C. BIGGS

Referral Judges

JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE

JOE L. WEBSTER

 

Party Details

Defendants

JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC

ITT CORPORATION

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL

VIACOMCBS INC.

3M COMPANY

COVIL CORPORATION

CBS CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION F

ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC

CRANE CO.

4520 CORP., INC.

DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION

GRINNELL, LLC. doing business as GRINNELL CORPORATION

AURORA PUMP COMPANY

TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION

SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC.

AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC.

MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY

FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC.

THE DURIRON COMPANY, INC.

17 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

STEPHANIE G. FLYNN

Attorney at FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP

2 West Washington Street, Suite 1100

Greenville, SC 29601

KIMBERLY SULLIVAN

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US), LLP

One Wells Fargo Ctr., Ste. 3500, 301 S. College St.

Charlotte, NC 28202-6025

M. ELIZABETH O'NEILL

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US), LLP

One Wells Fargo Ctr., Ste. 3500, 301 S. College St.

Charlotte, NC 28202-6025

W. DAVID CONNER

Attorney at HAYNSWORTH SINKLER BOYD, P.A.

Pob 2048

Greenville, SC 29602-2048

CHRISTOPHER BARTON MAJOR

Attorney at HAYNSWORTH SINKLER BOYD, P.A.

P.O. Box 2048

Greenville, SC 29602-2048

SCOTT E. FRICK

Attorney at HAYNSWORTH SINKLER BOYD, P.A.

Pob 2048

Greenville, SC 29602-2048

JENNIFER M. TECHMAN

Attorney at EVERT WEATHERSBY HOUFF

3455 Peachtree Road, Ste 1550

Atlanta, GA 30326

JONATHAN E. SCHULZ

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS LLP

214 North Tryon Street, Suite 3700

Charlotte, NC 28202

LESLIE C. PACKER

Attorney at ELLIS & WINTERS, LLP

Pob 33550

Raleigh, NC 27636

STEVEN A. SCOGGAN

Attorney at ELLIS & WINTERS, LLP

Pob 2752

Greensboro, NC 27402

ASHLEY KAMPHAUS BRATHWAITE

Attorney at ELLIS & WINTERS, LLP

4131 Parklake Avenue, Ste. 400

Raleigh, NC 27612

MARLA T. RESCHLY

Attorney at K&L GATES LLP

Hearst Tower, 47Th Floor, 214 N. Tryon St.

Charlotte, NC 28202

ANDERSON H. PHILLIPS

Attorney at YOUNG MOORE & HENDERSON, P.A.

3101 Glenwood Ave, Suite 200

Raleigh, NC 27612

DAVID MARSHALL DUKE

Attorney at YOUNG MOORE AND HENDERSON, P.A.

Pob 31627

Raleigh, NC 27622

Other Attorneys

AUDREY M. SNYDER

Attorney at WARD BLACK LAW

208 W. Wendover Ave.

Greensboro, NC 27401

JANET WARD BLACK

Attorney at WARD BLACK LAW

208 W. Wendover Ave.

Greensboro, NC 27401

PHILIP C. REID

Attorney at VON BRIESEN & ROPER, S. C.

411 E. Wisconsin Ave., Ste. 1000

Milwaukee, WI 53202

RHYAN J. LINDLEY

Attorney at VON BRIESEN & ROPER, S.C.

10 E. Doty Street, Suite 900

Madison, WI 53703

LAUREN E. FUSSELL

Attorney at WILLIAMS MULLEN

301 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1700

Raleigh, NC 27601

JOSHUA HAMILTON BENNETT

Attorney at BENNETT GUTHRIE LATHAM, PLLC

1560 Westbrook Plaza Dr.

Winston-Salem, NC 27103

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#87

No Description Available

#83

No Description Available

#80

No Description Available

#74

No Description Available

#68

No Description Available

#66

No Description Available

#64

No Description Available

#62

No Description Available

#60

No Description Available

#59

No Description Available

#56

No Description Available

#50

No Description Available

#47

No Description Available

#43

No Description Available

#41

No Description Available

#34

No Description Available

#33

No Description Available

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CRANE CO.. (MATHER, EMILY) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., answer due 12/5/2020. (Sheets, Jamie) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting #93 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC. For good cause shown, Defendant Aecom Energy & Construction, Inc. shall have up to and including December 5, 2020 within which to serve its answer or other responsive pleading. Issued by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 11/25/2020.(Lee, Pedra) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred: RE: #93 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Blay, Debbie) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney RHYAN J. LINDLEY on behalf of Defendant HENRY PRATT COMPANY, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2938474.) (LINDLEY, RHYAN) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) NOTICE of Special Appearance by attorney PHILIP C. REID on behalf of Defendant HENRY PRATT COMPANY, LLC ( Filing fee $ 25 receipt number 0418-2938453.) (REID, PHILIP) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) STIPULATION (Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC. (PHILLIPS, ANDERSON) Modified on 11/24/2020 to reflect counsel's request. (Powell, Gloria). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney DAVID MARSHALL DUKE on behalf of Defendant AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC. (DUKE, DAVID) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ANDERSON H. PHILLIPS on behalf of Defendant AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC. (PHILLIPS, ANDERSON) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE no longer assigned to the case. (Marsh, Keah) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS. CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER no longer assigned to the case. (Marsh, Keah) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by CRANE CO.. (MATHER, EMILY) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CRANE CO.. (MATHER, EMILY) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney MARLA T. RESCHLY on behalf of Defendant CRANE CO. (RESCHLY, MARLA) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney EMILY K. MATHER on behalf of Defendant CRANE CO. (MATHER, EMILY) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY, 4520 CORP., INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., AURORA PUMP COMPANY, BW/IP INC., CARBOLINE COMPANY, COVIL CORPORATION, CRANE CO., DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE US INC., FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., FMC CORPORATION, GOULD PUMPS, INCORPORATED, GRINNELL, LLC., HENRY PRATT COMPANY, LLC, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., ITT CORPORATION, JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC., STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA) LLC, TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION, VIACOMCBS INC., ZURN INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney AUDREY M. SNYDER on behalf of Plaintiff SADIE B. SMITH (SNYDER, AUDREY) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/7/2020) on behalf of attorney) (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2907646.), filed by SADIE B SMITH.(BLACK, JANET WARD) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN INSULATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COVIL CORPORATION is a litigant