This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:46:04 (UTC).

Smith v. Arc Flash Electric Corp.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Smith filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Arc Flash Electric Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Klindt and Harvey E. Schlesinger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01409

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

James R. Klindt

Presiding Judge

Harvey E. Schlesinger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frederick Smith

Defendant

Arc Flash Electric Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony J. Hall

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, PA

20 N Orange Ave, Suite 1600

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

Shands M. Wulbern

Attorney at The Law Office of Shands M. Wulbern, PA

Suite 5, 3063 Hartley Road

Jacksonville, FL 32257

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Arc Flash Electric Corp. (Wulbern, Shands) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Arc Flash Electric Corp. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16224920) filed by Frederick Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons)(Hall, Anthony) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Arc Flash Electric Corp. (PAM) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hall, Anthony) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#5

(#5) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Arc Flash Electric Corp..(Wulbern, Shands) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Arc Flash Electric Corp. (Wulbern, Shands) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Hall, Anthony) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Arc Flash Electric Corp..(Wulbern, Shands) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MGG) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Arc Flash Electric Corp. (PAM) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge James R. Klindt. New case number: 3:19-cv-1409-J-20JRK. (SJB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Arc Flash Electric Corp. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16224920) filed by Frederick Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons)(Hall, Anthony) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less