This case was last updated from PACER on 02/25/2020 at 02:32:41 (UTC).

Smith, Jr. v. City of Jackson, Tennessee et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Smith, Jr filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Jackson, Tennessee. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon A. York and J. Daniel Breen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01061

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jon A. York

Presiding Judge

J. Daniel Breen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reese L. Smith, Jr.

Clarksville, TN 37040

Defendants

Investigator FNU Long

Daryl Hubbard

Julien Wiser

Jennifer Knolton

City of Jackson, Tennessee

Joanna Clerk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Milton Dale Conder, Jr.

Attorney at RAINEY KIZER REVIERE & BELL

209 E. Main St., P.O. Box 1147

Jackson, TN 38302-1147

Matthew Robert Courtner

Attorney at RAINEY KIZER REVIERE & BELL, PLC - Jackson

209 E. Main Street, P.O. Box 1147

Jackson, TN 38302-1147

Jennifer Vallor Ivy

Attorney at RAINEY KIZER REVIERE & BELL, PLC - Jackson

209 E. Main Street, P.O. Box 1147

Jackson, TN 38302-1147

John D. Burleson

Attorney at RAINEY KIZER REVIERE & BELL

209 E. Main Street

Jackson, TN 38301

Mary Elizabeth McCullohs

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

P.O. Box 20207

Nashville, TN 37202-0207

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) CIVIL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 7/18/19. (ejc) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

#29

(#29) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS, AND DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 7/16/19. (mbm) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

#28

(#28) Clerk's Office Return Letter to Reese Smith. (cdi) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

#27

(#27) ORDER POSTPONING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 6/26/2019. (ars) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#26

(#26) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joanna Clerk, #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Julien Wiser, Daryl Hubbard, Jennifer Knolton, FNU Long, City of Jackson, Tennessee Objections to R&R due by 7/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 6/26/2019. (ars) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

13 #4

Exhibit 3 - Signed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Judgment

13 #3

Exhibit 2 - Reese Smith Comlaint

13 #2

Exhibit 1 - State v. Vann

13 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss

7 #1

Summons Hubbard

#5

(#5) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A PROPERLY COMPLETED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AFFIDAVIT OR PAY THE CIVIL FILING FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 3/29/2019. (ars) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

2 #1

envelope

#2

(#10) ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 5/1/2019. (ars) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

1 #4

judge's card

1 #3

envelope

1 #2

Notice of Summons

1 #1

attachment

#1

(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Reese L. Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 attachment, #2 Notice of Summons, #3 envelope, #4 judge's card)(mbm) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) CIVIL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 7/18/19. (ejc) (Entered: 07/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS, AND DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 7/16/19. (mbm) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Clerk's Office Return Letter to Reese Smith. (cdi) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) ORDER POSTPONING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 6/26/2019. (ars) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Joanna Clerk, #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Julien Wiser, Daryl Hubbard, Jennifer Knolton, FNU Long, City of Jackson, Tennessee Objections to R&R due by 7/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 6/26/2019. (ars) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Filing by Reese L. Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(skc) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Reese L. Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Redacted meds, #2 envelope)(mbm) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS, CITY OF JACKSON, TENNESSEE, JULIEN WISER, DARYL HUBBARD, INVESTIGATOR FNU LONG, AND JENNIFER KNOLTON SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Judge J. Daniel Breen on 6/3/19. (mbm) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • (#22) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference RESET TO 6/28/2019 10:00 AM in Jackson Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Jon A. York. Please see previous Setting Letter for instructions.(ars) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Filing by Reese L. Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(skc) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER denying as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 5/1/2019. (ars) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Burleson on behalf of City of Jackson, Tennessee, Daryl Hubbard, Jennifer Knolton, FNU Long, Julien Wiser (Burleson, John) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Milton Dale Conder, Jr on behalf of City of Jackson, Tennessee, Daryl Hubbard, Jennifer Knolton, FNU Long, Julien Wiser (Conder, Milton) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. The filer has been mailed the issued summons in order to effect service and the new docket entry reflects this. (Attachments: #1 Summons Hubbard, #2 Summons Gist, #3 Summons Knolton, #4 Summons Clerk, #5 Summons Long)(mbm) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • (#6) Case initiation fee received on today's date. $ 400.00, receipt number J4676007699. (skc) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE A PROPERLY COMPLETED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AFFIDAVIT OR PAY THE CIVIL FILING FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jon A. York on 3/29/2019. (ars) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (mbm) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (mbm) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Reese L. Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(mbm) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Reese L. Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 attachment, #2 Notice of Summons, #3 envelope, #4 judge's card)(mbm) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.