This case was last updated from PACER on 11/18/2021 at 07:08:11 (UTC).

Smith et al v. Watanabe et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 Smith filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Watanabe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laurel Beeler and Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-07872

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Laurel Beeler

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Grace Smith

Russell Rawlings

California Foundation for Independent Living Centers

Defendants

Mary Watanabe

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MANAGED HEALTH CARE

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN NORTHERN CALIFORNIA REGION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Carly Alexis Myers

Attorney at Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund

3075 Adeline Street, Suite 210

Berkeley, CA 94703

Claudia Center

Attorney at Disabiltiy Rights Education and Defense Fund

3075 Adeline Street, Suite 210

Berkeley, CA 94703

Michael S. Nunez

Attorney at Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld LLP

101 Mission Street, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-1738

Ernest James Galvan

Attorney at Rosen Bien Galvan & Grunfeld LLP

101 Mission Street, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-1738

Silvia Yee

Attorney at Disability Rights Education and Defense Fund

3075 Adeline Street, Suite 210

Berkeley, CA 94703

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Foundation for Independent Living Centers, Russell Rawlings, Grace Smith.. (Nunez, Michael) (Filed on 10/18/2021) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case,. Signed by The Clerk on 10/19/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2021) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#8

(#8) Proposed Summons. (Nunez, Michael) (Filed on 10/27/2021) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MANAGED HEALTH CARE, Mary Watanabe. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Foundation for Independent Living Centers, Russell Rawlings, Grace Smith (Nunez, Michael) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Foundation for Independent Living Centers, Russell Rawlings, Grace Smith (Nunez, Michael) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Foundation for Independent Living Centers, Russell Rawlings, Grace Smith (Nunez, Michael) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by California Foundation for Independent Living Centers, Russell Rawlings, Grace Smith (Nunez, Michael) (Filed on 11/3/2021) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MANAGED HEALTH CARE, Mary Watanabe. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2021) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons. (Nunez, Michael) (Filed on 10/27/2021) (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE. SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for January 11, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA. Case Management Statement due by January 4th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-07872-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2021) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case,. Signed by The Clerk on 10/19/21. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2021) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2021) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Foundation for Independent Living Centers, Russell Rawlings, Grace Smith.. (Nunez, Michael) (Filed on 10/18/2021) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/30/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2022 11:00 AM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/21/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2021) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT (no process) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16475036.). Filed byGrace Smith, California Foundation for Independent Living Centers, Russell Rawlings. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Galvan, Ernest) (Filed on 10/7/2021) Modified on 10/8/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF MANAGED HEALTH CARE is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael S. Nunez

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ernest James Galvan(Designation Retained)