This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2020 at 10:04:43 (UTC).

Kelly Smith et al v. Regions Bank et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 Kelly Smith filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Regions Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen Wells Roby and Barry W Ashe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02946

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen Wells Roby

Presiding Judge

Barry W Ashe

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Child #3

Kelly Smith

Child #1

Child #2

Defendants and 3Rd Party Plaintiffs

Custom Concrete Constructions, Inc.

CBRE, Inc.

Grange Insurance Company

All That Maintenance

Builders Mutual Insurance Company

Insurance Company of Pennsylvania

Regions Bank

Custom Concrete Construction, Inc.

All That Maintenance, LLC

Defendants and 3Rd Party Defendants

Builders Mutual Insurance Company

Custom Concrete Construction, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Leonard Joseph Cline, Jr.

Attorney at Leonard J. Cline, PLC

3021 35Th St., Suite A

Metairie, LA 70001

Donald Stephen Blum

Attorney at Law Office of Donald S. Blum

320 N. Carrollton Ave., Suite 101

New Orleans, LA 70119

Clinton G. Mead

Attorney at The Law Office Of Leonard J. Cline, PLC

3021 35Th Street, Suite A

Metairie, LA 70001

Lionel Joseph Favret, III

Attorney at Lionel J. Favret, III Attorney at Law

401 Rue Saint Ann, Suite B

Metairie, LA 70005

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles Kenneth Cicero, III

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois New Orleans

400 Poydras Street, Ste 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

James W. Hailey, III

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kay Austin Theunissen

Attorney at Mahtook & LaFleur (Lafayette)

600 Jefferson St., Suite 1000, P. O. Box 3089

Lafayette, LA 70502

Drew R. Ballina

Attorney at Heller, Draper & Horn, L.L.C.

650 Poydras Street, Ste 2500

New Orleans, LA 70130

Warren Horn

Attorney at Heller, Draper & Horn, L.L.C.

650 Poydras Street, Ste. 2500

New Orleans, LA 70130

Scott Stephen McCormick

Attorney at Organ and Associates

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70112

Coleman Taylor Organ

Attorney at Organ and Associates

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70112

Michael J. Madere

Attorney at Organ and Associates

909 Poydras St., Ste 3000

New Orleans, LA 70112

Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Drew R. Ballina

Attorney at Heller, Draper & Horn, L.L.C.

650 Poydras Street, Ste 2500

New Orleans, LA 70130

Warren Horn

Attorney at Heller, Draper & Horn, L.L.C.

650 Poydras Street, Ste. 2500

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Remand Letter

#11

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

1 #16

Certification of Compliance

1 #15

Certification of Notice

1 #14

Record (part 5 of 5)

1 #13

Record (part 4 of 5)

1 #12

Record (part 3 of 5)

1 #11

Record (part 2 of 5)

1 #10

Record (part 1 of 5)

1 #9

Certification of State Court Record

1 #7

Exhibit 3

1 #6

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 1 (part 3 of 5)

1 #2

Exhibit 1 (part 2 of 5)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 (part 1 of 5)

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the motion #10 is GRANTED, and this matter is REMANDED to the 24th Judicial District Court, Parish of Jefferson, State of Louisiana. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Remand Letter)(am) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/24/2020) (am). (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Document re #1 Notice of Removal, by CBRE, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Theunissen, Kay) Modified text on 11/24/2020 (am). (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: GRANTING #6 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Kay Austin Theunissen for CBRE, Inc. Attorney James W. Hailey, III and Charles Kenneth Cicero, III terminated. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/20/2020. (am) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Smith's motion [Doc. 3] is REFERRED to the magistrate judge for determination. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/20/2020.(am) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: GRANTING #5 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Clinton G. Mead for Kelly Smith. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/20/2020. (am) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw and Substitute Counsel of Record James Hailey and Charles Cicero as Attorney by CBRE, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hailey, James) Modified text on 11/20/2020 (am). (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Clinton G. Mead by Kelly Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Favret, Lionel) Modified text on 11/20/2020 (am). (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **DEFICIENT**Amendment/Supplement to Document by Kelly Smith re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court with Incorporated Motion and Order for Leave of Court to File Second Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages (Favret, Lionel) Modified text on 11/19/2020 (am). (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Remand to State Court with Incorporated Motion and Order for Leave of Court to File Second Supplemental and Amending Petition for Damages by Kelly Smith. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Proposed Order)(Favret, Lionel) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District for the Parish of Jefferson, case number 798-293-D (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8571665) filed by CBRE, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- part 1 , #2 Exhibit 1- part 2 , #3 Exhibit 1- part 3 , #4 Exhibit 1- part 4, #5 Exhibit 1- part 5, #6 Exhibit 1- part 6, #7 Exhibit 1- part 7, #8 Exhibit 1- part 8, #9 Exhibit 1- part 9, #10 Exhibit 2, #11 Exhibit 3, #12 List of parties and attorneys, #13 Certificate of filing of state court record, #14 Record- part 1, #15 Record- part 2, #16 Record- part 3, #17 Record- part 4, #18 Record- part 5, #19 Record- part 6, #20 Record- part 7, #21 Record- part 8, #22 Record- part 9, #23 Certificate of Notice, #24 Certificate of Compliance, #25 Civil Cover Sheet). Attorney Charles Kenneth Cicero, III added to party CBRE, Inc.(pty:dft).(Cicero, Charles) (All Documents replaced on 11/2/2020 due to redaction requirements) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Grange Insurance Association is a litigant

Latest cases where BUILDERS MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CBRE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Regions Bank is a litigant