This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/27/2022 at 08:14:08 (UTC).

Smith et al v. OPACHS, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 Smith filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against OPACHS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark S. Norris and Annie T. Christoff. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02263

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark S. Norris

Referral Judge

Annie T. Christoff

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kadryn Smith

Joseph Dabney

Defendants

OPACHS, LLC

Oscar Pruitt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Emmett Turner, IV

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Joseph Russ Bryant

Attorney at JACKSON SHIELDS YEISER & HOLT

262 German Oak Drive

Cordova, TN 38018

Defendant Attorney

Florence M. Johnson

Attorney at JOHNSON AND JOHNSON, PLLC

1407 Union Avenue, Ste 1002

Memphis, TN 38104

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A- Consents to Join for Kadryn Smith and Joseph Dabney

1 #3

Summons to be Issued

1 #4

Summons to be Issued

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#3

(#3) Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

summons

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Florence M. Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Florence) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Memorandum

9 #2

Certificate of Consultation

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) [**TEXT ORDER ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED**] ORDER GRANTING #9 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. For good cause shown, specifically to allow the new counsel to become more familiar with the case, Defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading in this matter on or before June 30, 2022. Signed by Judge Mark S. Norris on 06/03/2022. (Norris, Mark) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Proposed Order Submitted) by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Consultation)(Johnson, Florence) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Florence M. Johnson on behalf of All Defendants (Johnson, Florence) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to OPACHS, LLC, Oscar Pruitt. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 summons)(jae) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Judge Mark S. Norris and Magistrate Judge Annie T. Christoff added. (jae) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Emmett Turner, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Turner, Robert) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against OPACHS, LLC, Oscar Pruitt (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-3864916), filed by Kadryn Smith, Joseph Dabney. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Consents to Join for Kadryn Smith and Joseph Dabney, #3 Summons to be Issued, #4 Summons to be Issued)(Bryant, Joseph) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Florence M. Johnson