This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/05/2020 at 11:53:34 (UTC).

Smith et al v. Mohave, County of

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 Smith filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Mohave, County of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael T Morrissey (PS), James A Teilborg and Michael T Morrissey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-08165

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James A Teilborg

Referral Judges

Michael T Morrissey (PS)

Michael T Morrissey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Danasha Smith

Adelita Smith

Defendant

Mohave, County of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jody Lynn Broaddus

Attorney at Attorneys for Freedom Law Firm

3185 S Price Rd.

Chandler, AZ 85248

Marc Jeffrey Victor

Attorney at Attorneys for Freedom Law Firm

3185 S Price Rd.

Chandler, AZ 85248

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Boyd Smith

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2929 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Kevin Charles Nicholas

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

2929 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012-2761

Sarah Ann Schade

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2929 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Mohave, County of.(Smith, Michael) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Mohave, County of. (WLP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: (1) Plaintiffs must either serve the Defendant or seek a waiver of service by the Defendant. (2) If Plaintiffs do not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on the Defendant within 90 days of the filing of the Complaint, the action may be dismissed. Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 (m). (3) Defendant must answer the Complaint or otherwise respond by appropriate motion within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (4) This matter is assigned to the standard track pursuant to Rule 16.2(b)(3) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. (5) This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael T. Morrissey pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/13/2020. (WLP) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Submitted by Danasha Smith. (Broaddus, Jody) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Danasha Smith. (Broaddus, Jody) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Danasha Smith, Adelita Smith. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file correct document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DLC) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (DLC) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18451056 filed by Danasha Smith and Adelita Smith. (Broaddus, Jody) (DLC) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jody Lynn Broaddus