This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/09/2022 at 08:06:16 (UTC).

SMITH et al v. MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT et al

Case Summary

On 07/11/2022 SMITH filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Sweeney II and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-01367

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHN LEE SMITH, JR.

ESTATE OF JAMES LEROY SMITH

INDIVIDUALS UNKNOWN AT THIS TIME WHO MAY BECOME KNOWN THROUGH DISCOVERY

Defendants

MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT a.k.a. SHERIFF KERRY FORESTAL

WELLPATH a.k.a. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS

CARIN KOTTRABA

GABRA GACHAW

TINA FIELDS

BRIANN CAMPBELL

MARSHA CANNONIER

RACHEL CRABTREE

AYANA BROWN

HAYDEN

BARBARA REEVES

TANYA SHAW

REEL

CUTSHALL

ULAYI

DUSTIN BREWER

ERIC SMITH

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher P. Shema

Attorney at ATTORNEY & COUNSELOR AT LAW

Post Office Box 9806

Kay A. Beehler

313 S. Fruitridge Avenue, Terre Haute

Terre Haute, IN 47803

Defendant Attorneys

Amy Stewart Johnson

Attorney at FROST BROWN TODD LLC (Indianapolis)

201 North Illinois Street, Suite 1900, P.O. Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0961

Anthony W. Overholt

Attorney at FROST BROWN TODD LLC (Indianapolis)

201 North Illinois Street, Suite 1900, P.O. Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0961

Carol A. Dillon

Attorney at BLEEKE DILLON CRANDALL, P.C.

8470 Allison Pointe Boulevard, Suite 420

Indianapolis, IN 46250-4362

Christopher Andrew Farrington

Attorney at BLEEKE DILLON CRANDALL ATTORNEYS

8470 Allison Pointe Boulevard, Suite 420

Indianapolis, IN 46250

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) MEDICAL DEFENDANTS ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with JURY DEMAND , filed by MARSHA CANNONIER, RACHEL CRABTREE, GABRA GACHAW, CARIN KOTTRABA, BARBARA REEVES, WELLPATH a.k.a. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS.(Dillon, Carol) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by SUPERVISOR ALEXANDER, CLARK, COLLINS, HENDRY, HENRY, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT a.k.a. SHERIFF KERRY FORESTAL, MIDDLETON, ROBERTS, SISCO, TALBOT, ULAYI.(Overholt, Anthony) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony W. Overholt on behalf of Defendant ROBERTS. (Overholt, Anthony) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Stewart Johnson on behalf of Defendants SUPERVISOR ALEXANDER, CLARK, COLLINS, HENDRY, HENRY, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT a.k.a. SHERIFF KERRY FORESTAL, MIDDLETON, SISCO, TALBOT, ULAYI. (Johnson, Amy) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Andrew Farrington on behalf of Defendants MARSHA CANNONIER, RACHEL CRABTREE, GABRA GACHAW, CARIN KOTTRABA, BARBARA REEVES. (Farrington, Christopher) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#16

(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by MARSHA CANNONIER. MARSHA CANNONIER waiver sent on 7/11/2022. (Dillon, Carol) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#15

(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by CARIN KOTTRABA. CARIN KOTTRABA waiver sent on 7/11/2022. (Dillon, Carol) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#14

(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by GABRA GACHAW. GABRA GACHAW waiver sent on 7/11/2022. (Dillon, Carol) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by RACHEL CRABTREE. RACHEL CRABTREE waiver sent on 7/11/2022. (Dillon, Carol) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Andrew Farrington on behalf of Defendant WELLPATH a.k.a. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS. (Farrington, Christopher) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WELLPATH a.k.a. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS identifying Corporate Parent WELLPATH GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC for WELLPATH a.k.a. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS.. (Dillon, Carol) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Carol A. Dillon on behalf of Defendant WELLPATH a.k.a. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS. (Dillon, Carol) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (NLR) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony W. Overholt on behalf of Defendants FNU CLARK, LT., CIVILIAN COLLINS, DEPUTY HENDRY, DEPUTY HENRY, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, SUPERVISOR MIDDLETON, DEPUTY SISCO, DEPUTY TALBOT, ULAYI, DETECTIVE DEPUTY. (Overholt, Anthony) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

State Court Record Complaint, Summons, Appearance

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MEDICAL DEFENDANTS ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with JURY DEMAND , filed by MARSHA CANNONIER, RACHEL CRABTREE, GABRA GACHAW, CARIN KOTTRABA, BARBARA REEVES, WELLPATH a.k.a. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS.(Dillon, Carol) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by SUPERVISOR ALEXANDER, CLARK, COLLINS, HENDRY, HENRY, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT a.k.a. SHERIFF KERRY FORESTAL, MIDDLETON, ROBERTS, SISCO, TALBOT, ULAYI.(Overholt, Anthony) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony W. Overholt on behalf of Defendant ROBERTS. (Overholt, Anthony) (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Stewart Johnson on behalf of Defendants SUPERVISOR ALEXANDER, CLARK, COLLINS, HENDRY, HENRY, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT a.k.a. SHERIFF KERRY FORESTAL, MIDDLETON, SISCO, TALBOT, ULAYI. (Johnson, Amy) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Andrew Farrington on behalf of Defendants MARSHA CANNONIER, RACHEL CRABTREE, GABRA GACHAW, CARIN KOTTRABA, BARBARA REEVES. (Farrington, Christopher) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by MARSHA CANNONIER. MARSHA CANNONIER waiver sent on 7/11/2022. (Dillon, Carol) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by CARIN KOTTRABA. CARIN KOTTRABA waiver sent on 7/11/2022. (Dillon, Carol) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by GABRA GACHAW. GABRA GACHAW waiver sent on 7/11/2022. (Dillon, Carol) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by RACHEL CRABTREE. RACHEL CRABTREE waiver sent on 7/11/2022. (Dillon, Carol) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by BARBARA REEVES. BARBARA REEVES waiver sent on 7/11/2022. (Dillon, Carol) (Entered: 08/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION , filed by Plaintiff ESTATE OF JAMES LEROY SMITH. (Beehler, Kay) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF AUTOMATICE ENLARGEMENT OF TIME, filed by Defendant WELLPATH a.k.a. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS (Farrington, Christopher) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants CLARK, COLLINS, HENDRY, HENRY, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT a.k.a. SHERIFF KERRY FORESTAL, MIDDLETON, SISCO, TALBOT, ULAYI. (Overholt, Anthony) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Andrew Farrington on behalf of Defendant WELLPATH a.k.a. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS. (Farrington, Christopher) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WELLPATH a.k.a. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS identifying Corporate Parent WELLPATH GROUP HOLDINGS, LLC for WELLPATH a.k.a. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS.. (Dillon, Carol) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Carol A. Dillon on behalf of Defendant WELLPATH a.k.a. CORRECT CARE SOLUTIONS. (Dillon, Carol) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (NLR) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Submission of State Court Records from Marion County i case number 49D04-2206-PL-019908. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4)(JDC) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony W. Overholt on behalf of Defendants FNU CLARK, LT., CIVILIAN COLLINS, DEPUTY HENDRY, DEPUTY HENRY, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, SUPERVISOR MIDDLETON, DEPUTY SISCO, DEPUTY TALBOT, ULAYI, DETECTIVE DEPUTY. (Overholt, Anthony) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior 4, case number 49D04-2206-pl-019908, filed by DEPUTY SISCO, FNU CLARK, LT., ULAYI, DETECTIVE DEPUTY, CIVILIAN COLLINS, SUPERVISOR MIDDLETON, DEPUTY HENDRY, DEPUTY HENRY, DEPUTY TALBOT, MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7183144) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Complaint, Summons, Appearance, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Overholt, Anthony) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hayden is a litigant

Latest cases where REEL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MARION COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases where Wellpath LLC is a litigant