This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2022 at 07:05:41 (UTC).

Smith et al v. Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 Smith filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Love's Travel Stops Country Stores Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brett H Ludwig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00546

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brett H Ludwig

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johnny P Smith

Next Level Administrators, LLC

Next Level Administrators LLC

Defendants

Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.

ABC Insurance Company

DEF Company

GHI Insurance Company

JKL Company

MNO Insurance Company

Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard B Hess

Attorney at Gruber Law Offices LLC

100 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 2800

Milwaukee, WI 53202

William J Waltenberger

Attorney at Gruber Law Offices LLC

100 E Wisconsin Ave - Ste 2800

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Defendant Attorney

Lori M Lubinsky

Attorney at Axley Brynelson LLP

2 E Mifflin St - Ste 200, Po Box 1767

Madison, WI 53703

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 22-CV-2077 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4107953) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lubinsky, Lori)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc..(Lubinsky, Lori)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. (Lubinsky, Lori)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE Statement by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc. (Lubinsky, Lori)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE Statement by Johnny P Smith. (Waltenberger, William)

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Brett H Ludwig. To appear, the parties must call the Court conference line at 1-866-434-5269, and enter access code 1737450# before the scheduled hearing time. A formal written Rule 26(f) report must be filed no later than seven days before the scheduling conference. (cc: all counsel) (jad) (Main Document 7 replaced on 5/13/2022) (jad).

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan and Pretrial Report by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc. (Lubinsky, Lori)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan and Pretrial Report by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc. (Lubinsky, Lori)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Lubinsky, Lori)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Brett H Ludwig. To appear, the parties must call the Court conference line at 1-866-434-5269, and enter access code 1737450# before the scheduled hearing time. A formal written Rule 26(f) report must be filed no later than seven days before the scheduling conference. (cc: all counsel) (jad) (Main Document 7 replaced on 5/13/2022) (jad).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Johnny P Smith. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Waltenberger, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE Statement by Johnny P Smith. (Waltenberger, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DISCLOSURE Statement by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc. (Lubinsky, Lori)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCase Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. One or more party names have been modified - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (kah)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Brett H Ludwig; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (bx)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. (Lubinsky, Lori)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc..(Lubinsky, Lori)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 22-CV-2077 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4107953) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lubinsky, Lori)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MNO Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where JKL, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DEF CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. is a litigant