This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/11/2021 at 15:27:46 (UTC).

Smith et al v. Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Smith filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth M Hoyt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01186

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth M Hoyt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tracy L Smith

Domingo Galvan-Sauceda III

LaQuaita M Green

Domingo C Galvan

Guadalupe Trevino

Defendant

Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Tyson Wells

Attorney at Law Office of Bill Wells

Po Box 16737

Galveston, TX 77552

Defendant Attorneys

Russell Carter Lewis

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

910 Louisiana St

Houston, TX 77002

Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin

Attorney at Baker Botts LLP

One Shell Plaza, 910 Louisiana St

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit F

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Exhibit A - Motion to Consolidate

4 #2

Exhibit B - Proposed Order Granting Motion to Consolidate

#5

#6

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASES: Lead Case No. 4:19-cv-1460 and Member Case No. 4:21-cv-1186 (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Tracy Smith, LaQuaita M Green, Domngo Galvan-Sauceda III, Guadalupe Trevino and Domingo C. Galvan, filed.(thanniable, 4) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE - Defendant Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC's Notice of Motion to Consolidate by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Motion to Consolidate, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order Granting Motion to Consolidate)(Lewis, Russell) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC, filed.(Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/23/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133rd JDC, case number 2021-14735 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26262168) filed by Intercontinental Terminals Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Lewis, Russell) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Intercontinental Terminals Management Company is a litigant