This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/29/2020 at 08:25:57 (UTC).

Smith et al v. Hatcher et al

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 Smith filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Hatcher. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00167

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Tracy D. L. C. Smith

Candace A. Smith

Defendants

Andrea Browning

E. Neal Jump

Lieutenant Shuman

Chris Hatcher

Major Randy Austin

Glynn County, Georgia

Georgia Department of Human Services

Michael Heath

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James A Yancey, Jr.

Attorney at James A. Yancey, PC

704 G Street

Brunswick, GA 31520

Defendant Attorneys

Paul Jay Pontrelli

Attorney at Georgia Department of Law

40 Capitol Square, Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

Steven G. Blackerby

Attorney at Brown, Readdick, Bumgartner, Carter, Strickland

P.O. Box 220, 5 Glynn Avenue

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

Richard K. Strickland

Attorney at Brown, Readdick, Bumgartner, Carter, Strickland

P.O. Box 220, 5 Glynn Avenue

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

Stuart Fallin Sumner

Attorney at Oliver Maner, LLP

218 West State Street, P.O. Box 10186

Savannah, GA 31412-0386

 

Court Documents

#27

26 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#26

#25

24 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#24

#23

22 #1

Brief In Support

#22

1 #13

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #12

Exhibit J

1 #11

Exhibit I

1 #10

Exhibit H

1 #9

Exhibit G

1 #8

Exhibit F

1 #7

Exhibit E

1 #6

Exhibit D

#1

45 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #26 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/13/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/28/2020. (csr) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Consent MOTION for Clerk's Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Dismiss by Candace A. Smith, Tracy D. L. C. Smith. Responses due by 3/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Yancey, James) Modified on 2/28/2020 (csr). (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Randy Austin answer due 3/9/2020. (csr) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER granting #24 Motion for Clerk's Extension of Time (LR 6.1). Randy Austin answer due by 3/9/2020. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 2/19/2020. (csr) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Consent Motion for Clerks Extension of Time (LR 6.1) to March 9, 2020 by Randy Austin. Responses due by 3/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sumner, Stuart) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Andrea Browning, Georgia Department of Human Services. (Pontrelli, Paul) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION to Dismiss by Andrea Browning, Georgia Department of Human Services. Responses due by 2/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support)(Pontrelli, Paul) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to Complaint & Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1, filed by Glynn County, Georgia, Chris Hatcher, Michael Heath, E. Neal Jump, and Shuman. (Blackerby, Steven) Modified on 2/18/2020 (csr). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Candace A. Smith, Tracy D. L. C. Smith. Randy Austin served on 2/3/2020, answer due 2/24/2020. (Yancey, James) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrea Browning, Georgia Department of Human Services. Georgia Department of Human Services waiver sent on 1/31/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (Pontrelli, Paul) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Candace A. Smith, Tracy D. L. C. Smith. Andrea Browning served on 1/15/2020, answer due 2/5/2020. (Yancey, James) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION to Have Summons Issued for a Non Party re: #5 Summons Submitted. (csr) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Have Summons Issued for a Non Party re #5 Summons Submitted by Candace A. Smith, Tracy D. L. C. Smith. Responses due by 1/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Yancey, James) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Candace A. Smith, Tracy D. L. C. Smith. Glynn County, Georgia served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020; Chris Hatcher served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020; Michael Heath served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020; E. Neal Jump served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020; Shuman served on 1/8/2020, answer due 1/29/2020. (Yancey, James) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Submitted (Yancey, James) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/2/20. (slt) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (slt) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Candace A. Smith, Tracy D. L. C. Smith. (slt) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • Filing fee: $400, receipt number 113J-2752438 (slt) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Candace A. Smith, Tracy D. L. C. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Verification, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(slt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2020: #13 Civil Cover Sheet) (slt). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Glynn County, Georgia is a litigant

Latest cases where THE GEORGIA DEPARTMENT OF HUMAN SERVICES, EX REL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven G. Blackerby

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul Jay Pontrelli