This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/30/2019 at 08:15:12 (UTC).

Smith et al v. 20152 IH2 Borrower L.P.

Case Summary

On 07/01/2019 Smith filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 20152 IH2 Borrower L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Clarence Cooper. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03020

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Clarence Cooper

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Richelle Smith

Theresa L. Smith

Defendants

20152 IH2 Borrower L.P.

Twenty Fifteentwo IH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Tressa S. McCray

Attorney at Office of Tressa S. McCray

Suite 490 - Heritage Place, 4500 Hugh Howell Road

Tucker, GA 30084

Thomas P. de Rosay

Attorney at The Law Office Of Tressa S. McCray, P.C.

4500 Hugh Howell Rd, Suite 490

Tucker, GA 30084

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Hilliard Schroder

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers, LLP

The Peachtree, Suite 300, 1355 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3231

Lauren E. H. Meadows

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers, LLP

The Peachtree, Suite 300, 1355 Peachtree St., N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3231

 

Court Documents

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Exhibit Order Granting Name Change 10-5-2000

#3

#2

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit -D

1 #4

Exhibit -C

1 #3

Exhibit -B

1 #2

Exhibit -A

1 #1

Certificate

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE by 20152 IH2 Borrower L.P. DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF INTENT TO SERVE SUBPOENAS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND THINGS (Meadows, Lauren) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE by 20152 IH2 Borrower L.P. of Intent to Serve Subpoenas for Production of Documents (Meadows, Lauren) (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery by 20152 IH2 Borrower L.P..(Meadows, Lauren) (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Initial Disclosures by Richelle Smith, Theresa L. Smith.(de Rosay, Thomas) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SCHEDULING ORDER approving #5 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery shall proceed on an Eight Month Track closing on 3/29/2019. Signed by Judge Clarence Cooper on 7/31/19. (bjh) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Disclosures by 20152 IH2 Borrower L.P..(Meadows, Lauren) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by 20152 IH2 Borrower L.P.. (Meadows, Lauren) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by 20152 IH2 Borrower L.P. identifying Other Affiliate 20152 IH2 Borrower G.P., LLC for 20152 IH2 Borrower L.P.. (Meadows, Lauren) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Richelle Smith, Theresa L. Smith Of Prior Name Change of Attorney for Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Granting Name Change 10-5-2000)(de Rosay, Thomas) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by 20152 IH2 Borrower L.P.. Discovery ends on 11/29/2019.(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by 20152 IH2 Borrower L.P.. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-8765531) (Attachments: #1 Certificate, #2 Exhibit -A, #3 Exhibit -B, #4 Exhibit -C, #5 Exhibit -D, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 2015-2 IH BORROWER, LP is a litigant