This case was last updated from PACER on 03/05/2019 at 07:53:08 (UTC).

Smith, Alexander et al v. Smith, Karol et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2019 Smith, Alexander filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Smith, Karol. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00008

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dennis Stenslien

Gwendolyn Pangburn

Alexander Smith

Robert Smith

Danielle Zoerb

Defendants

Gunderson Lutheran Health System, Inc.

Estate of Martin Jay Smith

Martin J. Smith and Karol I. Smith Joint Revocable Trust of January 24, 2017

Trust Point Inc.

Karol I. Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin William Peterson

Attorney at Moen Sheehan Meyer Ltd

201 Main Street, Ste. 700, Po Box 786

La Crosse, WI 54602-0786

Defendant Attorneys

Ryan Nicholas Parsons

Attorney at Foley & Lardner

777 E Wisconsin Ave

Milwaukee, WI 53202

David J. Sisson

Attorney at Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren s.c.

1000 North Water Street, Suite 2100

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Caitlyn Beaudry Sikorski

Attorney at Reinhart Boerner Van Deuren s.c.

1000 North Water Street, Suite 2100

Milwaukee, WI 53202

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Acknowledgment of Receipt of Record by La Crosse County Circuit Court. (kwf) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/1/2019. (kwf) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order to Remand Case to State Court

#4

(#4) Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court by Defendants Martin J. Smith and Karol I. Smith Joint Revocable Trust of January 24, 2017, Karol I. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Remand Case to State Court) (Sisson, David) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Gunderson Lutheran Health System, Inc. (Parsons, Ryan) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Service by Defendants Martin J. Smith and Karol I. Smith Joint Revocable Trust of January 24, 2017, Karol I. Smith as to #1 Notice of Removal. (Sisson, David) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

1 #8

Exhibit H - Smith Answer to Gunderson Crossclaim

1 #7

Exhibit G - Plaintiffs' Crossclaim Reply

1 #6

Exhibit F - Gundersen Answer and Crossclaim

1 #5

Exhibit E - Gundersen Lutheran Consent to Removal

1 #4

Exhibit D - Smith Answer to Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit C - Admission of Service

1 #2

Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from La Crosse County Circuit Court, case number 18CV595. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2386543), filed by Karol I. Smith, Martin J. Smith and Karol I. Smith Joint Revocable Trust of January 24, 2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Admission of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Smith Answer to Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Gundersen Lutheran Consent to Removal, #6 Exhibit F - Gundersen Answer and Crossclaim, #7 Exhibit G - Plaintiffs' Crossclaim Reply, #8 Exhibit H - Smith Answer to Gunderson Crossclaim) (Sisson, David) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Acknowledgment of Receipt of Record by La Crosse County Circuit Court. (kwf) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 2/1/2019. (kwf) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court by Defendants Martin J. Smith and Karol I. Smith Joint Revocable Trust of January 24, 2017, Karol I. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order to Remand Case to State Court) (Sisson, David) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Gunderson Lutheran Health System, Inc. (Parsons, Ryan) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Standard attachments for Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: #Corporate Disclosure Statement, #Order Regarding Assignment of Cases, #Notice of Assignment to a Magistrate Judge and Consent/Request for Reassignment, #Order on Dispositive Motions. (kwf) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Service by Defendants Martin J. Smith and Karol I. Smith Joint Revocable Trust of January 24, 2017, Karol I. Smith as to #1 Notice of Removal. (Sisson, David) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from La Crosse County Circuit Court, case number 18CV595. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2386543), filed by Karol I. Smith, Martin J. Smith and Karol I. Smith Joint Revocable Trust of January 24, 2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Admission of Service, #4 Exhibit D - Smith Answer to Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - Gundersen Lutheran Consent to Removal, #6 Exhibit F - Gundersen Answer and Crossclaim, #7 Exhibit G - Plaintiffs' Crossclaim Reply, #8 Exhibit H - Smith Answer to Gunderson Crossclaim) (Sisson, David) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.