This case was last updated from PACER on 02/06/2021 at 12:18:36 (UTC).

SmileDirectClub, LLC v. Candid Care Co.

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 SmileDirectClub, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Candid Care Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01115

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SmileDirectClub, LLC

Defendant

Candid Care Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul V. Storm

Attorney at Foley Gardere

2021 Mckinney Ave., Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Cynthia J. Rigsby

Attorney at Foley and Lardner LLP

777 East Wisconsin Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Michelle A. Moran

Attorney at Foley & Lardner LLP

777 East Wisconsin Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Kelsey C. Boehm

777 E Wisconsin Ave

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Sarah E. Rieger

Attorney at Foley and Lardner LLP

777 East Wisconsin Avenue

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Sara Ann Brown

Attorney at Foley Gardere

2021 Mckinney Avenue, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

Michael P. Sandonato

Attorney at Venable LLP

1270 Avenue Of The Americas, 24Th Fl.

New York, NY 10020

Jack Wesley Hill

Attorney at Ward Smith & Hill, PLLC

1507 Bill Owens Pkwy

Longview, TX 75604

Andrea L. Fair

Attorney at Ward, Smith & Hill, PLLC

Po Box 1231

Longview, TX 75606

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Candid Care Co., re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Candid Care Co. (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul V. Storm re Kelsey Boehm ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14341061) by on behalf of SmileDirectClub, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Storm, Paul) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

12 #6

Exhibit 6

12 #5

Exhibit 5

12 #4

Exhibit 4

12 #3

Exhibit 3

12 #2

Exhibit 2

12 #1

Exhibit 1

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss by Candid Care Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

6 #1

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice

5 #1

Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice

#5

Text Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cynthia J. Rigsby for SmileDirectClub, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by SmileDirectClub, LLC. (Storm, Paul) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Storm, Paul) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#2

(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SmileDirectClub, LLC. (Storm, Paul) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - U.S. Pat. No. 10861599

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14263175). No Summons requested at this time, filed by SmileDirectClub, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Pat. No. 10861599, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Storm, Paul) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Candid Care Co., re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Candid Care Co. (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kelsey C. Boehm for SmileDirectClub, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael P. Sandonato for Candid Care Co. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by SmileDirectClub, LLC, re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Candid Care Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rigsby, Cynthia) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STATUS REPORT regarding Case Readiness by SmileDirectClub, LLC. (Rigsby, Cynthia) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul V. Storm re Kelsey Boehm ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14341061) by on behalf of SmileDirectClub, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Storm, Paul) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrea L. Fair (for Michael P. Sandonato) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14340679) by on behalf of Candid Care Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Candid Care Co.. (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss by Candid Care Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea L. Fair on behalf of Candid Care Co.. Attorney Andrea L. Fair added to party Candid Care Co.(pty:dft) (Fair, Andrea) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michelle A. Moran for SmileDirectClub, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Cynthia J. Rigsby for SmileDirectClub, LLC. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mm6) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul V. Storm re Sarah E. Rieger ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14268386) by on behalf of SmileDirectClub, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Storm, Paul) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul V. Storm re Michelle A. Moran ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14268362) by on behalf of SmileDirectClub, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Storm, Paul) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul V. Storm ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14268247) by on behalf of SmileDirectClub, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Storm, Paul) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by SmileDirectClub, LLC. (Storm, Paul) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bw) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Storm, Paul) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by SmileDirectClub, LLC. (Storm, Paul) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14263175). No Summons requested at this time, filed by SmileDirectClub, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Pat. No. 10861599, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Storm, Paul) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Candid Care Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where SmileDirectClub, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sara Ann Brown

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Elizabeth Rieger