This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2021 at 13:34:17 (UTC).

SmileDirectClub LLC v. Align Technology Incorporated

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 SmileDirectClub LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Align Technology Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Douglas L Rayes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-MC-00021

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Douglas L Rayes

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SmileDirectClub LLC

Respondent

Align Technology Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Jeremy C Johnson

Attorney at Jones Skelton & Hochuli PLC

40 N Central Ave., Ste. 2700

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Respondent Attorneys

Jameson R Jones

Attorney at Bartlit Beck LLP - Denver, CO

1801 Wewatta St., Ste. 1200

Denver, CO 80202

Matthew Robert Koerner

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2901 N Central Ave., Ste. 2000

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Jean-Jacques Cabou

Attorney at Perkins Coie LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2901 N Central Ave., Ste. 2000

Phoenix, AZ 85012

 

Court Documents

#14

#13

12 #1

Exhibit

#12

#10

#9

8 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A-E

8 #1

Supplement Declaration of Joseph Doman

#8

#7

#5

#2

1 #5

Text of Proposed Order

1 #4

Certificate

1 #3

Declaration

1 #2

Memorandum

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketRemark: Case transferred to Middle District of Tennessee by electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Align's motion to transfer (Doc. #8 ) is GRANTED. This matter is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/1/2021. (WLP) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY to Response to Motion re: #1 MOTION to Compel, #8 MOTION to Transfer Related Case , RESPONSE to Motion re: #8 MOTION to Transfer Related Case filed by SmileDirectClub LLC. (Johnson, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY to Response to Motion re: #1 MOTION to Compel, #8 MOTION to Transfer Related Case filed by SmileDirectClub LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Johnson, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER: The telephone conference set for 5/25/21 regarding SmileDirectClub's #1 Motion to Enforce Subpoena is VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jameson R Jones on behalf of Respondent Align Technology Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Align Technology Incorporated. (Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Align Technology Incorporated. (Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) *MOTION to Transfer Case, RESPONSE in Opposition to #1 MOTION to to Enforce Subpoena filed by Align Technology Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration of Joseph Doman, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-E)(Cabou, Jean-Jacques) *Modified to add Motion part on 5/17/2021 (WLP). (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jean-Jacques Cabou on behalf of Align Technology Incorporated. (Cabou, Jean-Jacques) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER: Based on Petitioner's #5 Notice of Service of Motion, the Telephone Conference set for 5/11/2021 is vacated and reset. Telephone Conference reset for 5/25/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. Petitioner SmileDirectClub LLC shall provide notice of this hearing to Respondent Align Technology Inc. The parties will be provided with call-in information via separate email. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE re: of Service of Motion to Enforce Subpoena Upon Defendant by SmileDirectClub LLC . (Johnson, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED setting a telephonic conference re: #1 Motion to Enforce Subpoena to Align Technology, Inc. for 5/11/2021 at 09:30AM. The parties will be provided with call-in information via separate email. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner SmileDirectClub LLC shall serve Respondent Align Technology Inc with the motion and this order, and provide proof thereof, no later than 5/7/2021. Ordered by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/3/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19366480. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes for a ruling on Motions to Enforce Subpoena Duces Tecum - FRCVP 37(a) and 45(c)(2)(B). All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: MC-21-21-PHX-DLR. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ARC) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SmileDirectClub LLC. (Johnson, Jeremy) (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(ARC) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) *Miscellaneous Case Opening Regarding: Motions to Enforce Subpoena Duces Tecum - FRCVP 37(a) and 45(c)(2)(B). Case Opening Fee Received: $ 49.00 receipt number 0970-19366480 filed by SmileDirectClub LLC. (Johnson, Jeremy) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Memorandum, #3 Declaration, #4 Certificate, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(ARC) *Modified file date from 4/16/21 to 4/15/21; NEF regenerated on 4/16/2021 (CEI). (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Align Technology, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where SmileDirectClub, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jean-Jacques Cabou(Designation Retained)