This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2019 at 07:30:19 (UTC).

Smelser v. Discover Bank

Case Summary

On 05/30/2019 Smelser filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Discover Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan O. Hickey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01025

  • Filing Date:

    05/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan O. Hickey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffrey Smelser

Defendant

Discover Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Chami

Attorney at Attorney at Law

8245 North 85Th Way

Scottsdale, AZ 85258

Defendant Attorney

Justin L. Jones

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP

736 Georgia Avenue, Suite 300

Chattanooga, TN 37402

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#15

(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint by Discover Bank. (Jones, Justin) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#8

RESTRICTED

#14

(#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Complaint. Discover Bank answer due 7/29/2019. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 22, 2019. (rwg) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin L. Jones on behalf of Discover Bank. (Jones, Justin) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Discover Bank. (Jones, Justin) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by Jeffrey Smelser. Discover Bank served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Chami, David) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jeffrey Smelser. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (cnn) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Complaint by Discover Bank. (Jones, Justin) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Discover Bank answer due 7/22/2019. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 3, 2019. (mll) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by Jeffrey Smelser. Discover Bank served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Chami, David) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Discover Bank ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1923768), filed by Jeffrey Smelser.(Chami, David) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#4

RESTRICTED

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint by Discover Bank. (Jones, Justin) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Complaint. Discover Bank answer due 7/29/2019. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 22, 2019. (rwg) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Complaint by Discover Bank. (Jones, Justin) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Discover Bank answer due 7/22/2019. Signed by Honorable Susan O. Hickey on July 3, 2019. (mll) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Discover Bank. (Jones, Justin) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Justin L. Jones on behalf of Discover Bank. (Jones, Justin) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by Jeffrey Smelser. Discover Bank served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Chami, David) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Re-Issued as to Discover Bank and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Discover Bank for service of the following document: #2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint. (Chami, David) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by Jeffrey Smelser. Discover Bank served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. (Chami, David) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Discover Bank and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (cnn) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Discover Bank for service of the following document: #2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint. (Chami, David) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Discover Bank ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1923768), filed by Jeffrey Smelser.(Chami, David) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (cnn) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jeffrey Smelser. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (cnn) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less