This case was last updated from PACER on 12/26/2020 at 08:13:27 (UTC).

Smeez, Inc. v. Badger Mutual Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Smeez, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Badger Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David W. Dugan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01132

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David W. Dugan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Smeez, Inc. d/b/a Big Daddy's Disco Diner, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Smeez, Inc. individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated doing business as Big Daddy's Disco Diner,

Defendant

Badger Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Gerard Stranch, IV

Attorney at Branstetter, Stranch & Jennings, PLLC

223 Rosa L. Parks Avenue, Suite 200

Nashville, TN 37203

Amina Thomas

Attorney at Cohen & Malad, LLP

One Indiana Square, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

David I. Cates

Attorney at Cates Mahoney, LLC

216 West Pointe Drive, Suite A

Swansea, IL 62226

Lynn A Toops

Attorney at Cohen & Malad, LLP

One Indiana Square, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Scott J. Helfand

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP - Chicago

120 South Riverside Plaza, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

Kayla E. Foley

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP - Chicago

120 South Riverside Plaza, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#23

#21

#20

#19

18 #4

Exhibit 4 (Order, Musso & Frank Grill Co)

18 #2

Exhibit 2 (Transcript, It's Nice)

18 #1

Exhibit 1 (Certified Cover Sheet and Complete Policy)

#18

#17

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #23 Status Report filed by Smeez, Inc. A completed form Joint Report of Parties and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order shall be submitted, not filed, to the assigned judges e-mail address for proposed documents. The subject line of the e- mail must include the case number and reference Joint Report. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) STRICKEN STATUS REPORT and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order by Smeez, Inc.. (Toops, Lynn) Modified on 12/22/2020 (tba). (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER Granting #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Smeez, Inc. For good cause shown and without objection from Defendant, Plaintiff's motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss (Doc. #17 ) shall be filed on or before January 21, 2021. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 12/10/2020. (kll)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Smeez, Inc.. (Toops, Lynn) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/5/2021 at 10:00 AM via Zoom video conference before Judge David W. Dugan. The Parties will receive the appropriate Zoom invitation via email from the Court. The Joint Report of the Parties is due on or before 12/29/2020 and shall be submitted via email to DWDpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 12/3/2020. (dmw2) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CJRA TRACK D assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2022 at 10:00 AM and Jury Trial set for 11/28/2022 at 9:00 AM both in the East St. Louis Courthouse before Judge David W. Dugan. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 12/3/2020. (dmw2) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MEMORANDUM in Support re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Badger Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Certified Cover Sheet and Complete Policy), #2 Exhibit 2 (Transcript, It's Nice), #3 Exhibit 3 (Transcript, Gavrilides), #4 Exhibit 4 (Order, Musso & Frank Grill Co))(Helfand, Scott) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Badger Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/7/2021 (Helfand, Scott) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Cates, David) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE REGARDING FILING re #12 Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge, #13 Notice of Appearance filed by Badger Mutual Insurance Company are fillable documents. Fillable documents should be converted to non-fillable PDF before filing on CM/ECF. This Notice is sent for informational purposes only. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) by Badger Mutual Insurance Company. (Helfand, Scott) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Amina Thomas on behalf of Plaintiff; granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney J. Gerald Stranch IV on behalf of Plaintiff. (lmb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney J. Gerard Stranch, IV $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4322090 by on behalf of Smeez, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing MDTN, #2 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing TN Supr Ct)(Stranch, J.) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by David I. Cates on behalf of Smeez, Inc. (Cates, David) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Amina Thomas $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4321711 by on behalf of Smeez, Inc.. (Thomas, Amina) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn A Toops on behalf of Smeez, Inc. (Toops, Lynn) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Badger Mutual Insurance Company, Smeez, Inc.. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-1132-GCS. Consent due by 11/18/2020 (lmb) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Badger Mutual Insurance Company. (Helfand, Scott) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott J. Helfand on behalf of Badger Mutual Insurance Company (Helfand, Scott) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twentieth Judicial Circuit, St. Clair County, Illinois, case number 20L0758 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4319759), filed by Badger Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Helfand, Scott) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Badger Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David I. Cates

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lynn A Toops

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Gerard Stranch, IV